New Jersey District Court
Judge:William J Martini
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:24-cv-06021
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Re-opened:Apr 04, 2025
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 4:50 AM EST
Defendant
BROWERTOWN ASSOCIATES, INC.
55 South Newman Street
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
MICHAEL W. O'HARA
Bisgaier Hoff, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MEDFORD CONVALESCENT & NURSING CENTER
55 South Newman Street
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
MICHAEL W. O'HARA
Bisgaier Hoff, LLC
contact info
Defendant
REGENT CARE CENTER, INC.
55 South Newman Street
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
MICHAEL W. O'HARA
Bisgaier Hoff, LLC
contact info
Defendant
TANDEM MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
55 South Newman Street
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
MICHAEL W. O'HARA
Bisgaier Hoff, LLC
contact info
Defendant
TUSCHAK JACOBSON, INC.
433 Hackensack Avenue, Floor 8
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
MICHAEL W. O'HARA
Bisgaier Hoff, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By
DENNIS EDWARD KADIAN
Thomas Kadian LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
23 23 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/15 3:03 PM
TEXT ORDER: Status conference. Parties completing final stages of settlement. The Court will hold a teleconference on 5/20/25 at 2:30 p.m. using the Webex platform. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/15/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 04/15 2:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 4/15/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
22 22 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/04 2:56 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference on 4/15/25 at 2 p.m. using the Webex platform. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/4/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/04 12:20 PM
ORDER REOPENING CIVIL CASE that this action be and is reopened and placed back on the court's active docket. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/4/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Thu 04/03 10:34 AM
Letter from Dennis E. Kadian.(KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed Order Reopening Civil Case
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Tue 02/11 11:38 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/14/2025. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 2/11/2025. (krg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 02/11 10:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 2/11/2025. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
18 18 order Text Order Tue 12/03 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER: Parties in settlement discussions. The Court will hold a teleconference on 2/11/25 at 10:30am using the Webex platform. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/3/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 12/03 12:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 12/3/2024. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
17 17 order Text Order Mon 12/02 2:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold the next teleconference in this matter using the Webex platform. Parties are to use the teleconference dial-in: 855-244-8681 and Access Code: 23021816037. An attendee ID # is not needed.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/2/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 1:16 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/22/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 07/22 10:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/22/2024. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
15 15 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 06/14 9:49 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 7/22/24 at 10:30am Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201. Local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order (for Judge Salas cases, please use her dedicated PTSO found in the same location) found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/14/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Fri 06/14 9:49 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/04 4:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(O'HARA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Disclosure Statement
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/22 2:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. REGENT CARE CENTER, INC. served on 5/17/2024, answer due 6/7/2024. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/22 2:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. MEDFORD CONVALESCENT & NURSING CENTER served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/22 2:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. BROWERTOWN ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 5/17/2024, answer due 6/7/2024. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/22 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. TUSCHAK JACOBSON, INC. served on 5/17/2024, answer due 6/7/2024. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/22 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. TANDEM MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC served on 5/17/2024, answer due 6/7/2024. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
8 8 misc Affidavit Tue 05/21 12:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Regent Care Center, Inc. c/o Richard Pineles by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Affidavit Tue 05/21 12:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Medford Convalescent & Nursing Center c/o Jack Penelis by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit Tue 05/21 12:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Browertown Associates, Inc. c/o Richard Pineles by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Affidavit Tue 05/21 12:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Tuschak Jacobson, Inc. c/o Richard Pineles by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Affidavit Tue 05/21 12:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Tandem Management Company, LLC c/o Richard Pineles by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 05/16 3:11 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY. (KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/16 10:47 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BROWERTOWN ASSOCIATES, INC., MEDFORD CONVALESCENT & NURSING CENTER, REGENT CARE CENTER, INC., TANDEM MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, TUSCHAK JACOBSON, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 05/16 10:44 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Mon 05/13 10:07 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15359862), filed by COLUMBIA CASUALTY COMPANY.(KADIAN, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement Disclosure Statement,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/15 11:51 AM
Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
Related: [-]