Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-00779
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:May 09, 2024
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 05, 2024 4:15 AM EST
Appellant
Towd Point Master Funding Trust 201-PM7
Represented By
Robert Ryan Michael
Bww Law Group Llc (richmond)
contact info
Appellee
Thomas P. Gorman
Represented By
Thomas P Gorman
contact info
Marcelo Ramiro Michel
contact info
Appellee
Deok Hee Pridgen
Represented By
James Y. Victory
Hanmi Center For Justice PLLC
contact info
Appellee
Professional Foreclosure Corporation of Virginia
Represented By
Gregory N. Britto
Logs Legal Group, LLP
contact info
Gregory Nelson Britto
Shapiro & Burson
contact info
In Re:
David Clay Pridgen
In Re:
Deok Hee Pridgen
Interested Party
USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
8 8 9 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Order Wed 03/26 7:48 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER that this appeal is DISMISSED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to place this matter among the ended causes (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/25/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
7 7 appeal Appellees Brief Thu 08/08 3:28 PM
Appellee's BRIEF by Thomas P. Gorman. (Michel, Marcelo)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/08 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marcelo Ramiro Michel on behalf of Thomas P. Gorman (Michel, Marcelo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
5 5 appeal Appellants Brief Wed 07/10 6:15 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by Towd Point Master Funding Trust 201-PM7. (Michael, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
4 4 appeal Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Mon 06/10 11:35 AM
Bankruptcy Scheduling Order - Appellant Brief due by 7/10/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
3 3 misc Sealed Document Mon 06/10 11:30 AM
Sealed Document. (swil)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet Mon 06/10 11:29 AM
Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Record on Appeal
Thursday, May 09, 2024
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Mon 05/13 8:27 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-12272 KHK Adv. Proceeding No. 23-01040 KHK, filed by Towd Point Master Funding Trust 201-PM7.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal