Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:24-cv-01156
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
Tarik Elmohd
Represented By
Jason A. Brazelton
Law Office Of Jason A. Brazelton
contact info
Defendant
Miguel Layuza
Represented By
Victor Luis Zamora
Viza Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Blackboard Insurance Company
Represented By
Jackson Frederick Shuford
Hicks, Porter, Ebenfeld & Stein, P.A.
contact info
Irene Marie Porter
Hicks, Porter, Ebenfeld & Stein, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
21 21 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 02/24 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JOS)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Judgment Mon 02/24 9:05 AM
JUDGMENT that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JOS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
19 19 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/21 3:02 PM
ORDER. Defendant Elmohd's Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay Proceedings (Doc. 8 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Complaint (Doc. 1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly, terminate any pending deadlines, and close the file. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 2/21/2025. (SV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 02/05 9:01 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2025, Discovery due by 9/26/2025, Dispositive motions due by 10/24/2025, Pretrial statement due by 2/13/2026, Motions in Limine due by 2/10/2026, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/25/2025, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/25/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2026 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 9 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Jury Trial set for term commencing 3/2/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 9 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/10/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 2/5/2025. (CAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
17 17 misc Case Management Report Tue 02/04 3:20 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Shuford, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 01/22 11:05 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Tarik Elmohd. (Brazelton, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/10 3:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Miguel Layuza. (Zamora, Victor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 01/07 4:12 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Blackboard Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Shuford, Jackson)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 01/07 4:10 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Blackboard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Blackboard U.S. Holdings, Inc. for Blackboard Insurance Company.. (Shuford, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/02 5:07 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Miguel Layuza.(Zamora, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/19 11:01 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and or Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Shuford, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons returned executed Mon 08/12 1:08 PM
RETURN of service executed on 08/01/2024 by Blackboard Insurance Company as to Miguel Layuza. (Shuford, Jackson)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proof of service Mon 08/12 10:30 AM
PROOF of service by Blackboard Insurance Company (Shuford, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/05 5:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Motion to Stay Proceedings by Tarik Elmohd. (Brazelton, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of appearance Thu 07/11 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Brazelton on behalf of Tarik Elmohd (Brazelton, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Thu 06/20 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Frederick Shuford on behalf of Blackboard Insurance Company (Shuford, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
5 5 service Summons issued Tue 05/14 3:34 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Tarik Elmohd, Miguel Layuza. (RLK)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 05/14 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Irene Marie Porter on behalf of Blackboard Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Irene Porter. (Porter, Irene)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 05/14 12:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Irene Marie Porter and Jackson Frederick Shuford of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/14 12:29 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-1156-JLB-AEP. (AJS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/14 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22088528) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Shuford, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Blackboard Policy (Premium Information Redacted),
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons