Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10628

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:24-ap-01105
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Terminated:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Alfred Tindall
Represented By
James Alfred Tindall
contact info
Plaintiff
Green Earth Technologies, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Brinen
Kutner Brinen Dickey Riley, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Halo Laboratories, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Brinen
Kutner Brinen Dickey Riley, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, January 13, 2025
36 36 order Judgment for AP Case Mon 01/13 4:09 PM
Judgment Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 35 Other Order
35 35 order Other Order Mon 01/13 4:05 PM
Order Denying Motion To Vacate Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 31 Motion
Monday, December 09, 2024
34 34 answer Reply Mon 12/09 1:18 PM
Reply Filed by Henry Baskerville on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC, Halo Laboratories, LLC Related [+]. (Baskerville, Henry)
Related: [-] 31 Motion
Monday, December 02, 2024
33 33 answer Response Mon 12/02 7:18 PM
Response Filed by George D. Bruntz on behalf of James Alfred Tindall Related [+]. (Bruntz, George)
Related: [-] 31 Motion
32 32 answer Response Mon 12/02 7:00 PM
Disregard this entry, see doc 33 Response Filed by George D. Bruntz on behalf of James Alfred Tindall Related [+]. (Bruntz, George) Modified on 12/3/2024 per e-filer request (rjr)
Related: [-] 31 Motion
Monday, November 18, 2024
31 31 motion Motion Mon 11/18 4:47 PM
Motion to Vacate the Order Entered on October 22, 2024 Filed by Henry Baskerville on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC, Halo Laboratories, LLC Related [+]. (Baskerville, Henry)
Related: [-] 30 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 11/08 4:49 PM
Adversary Case Number 24-01105 JGR Closed. (td)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
30 30 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/22 11:39 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 10/22 11:40 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 24-01105 JGR. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Close Date 11/6/2024. (rxc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
29 29 order File Tue 10/08 11:38 AM
Order To File Status Report Related [+]. Status Report due by 10/15/2024 for28 , (rxc)
Related: [-] 28 Scheduling Order
Thursday, August 29, 2024
28 28 order Scheduling Order (Adversary) Thu 08/29 1:00 PM
Amended Order Regarding Compliance With Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7026 (Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) and (f)). Related [+].,11 Scheduling Order. Written Report due by 10/2/2024 for1 , (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
27 27 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/27 4:18 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Henry Baskerville on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC, Halo Laboratories, LLC... (Baskerville, Henry)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/16 11:08 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/16/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Thursday, August 15, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/15 10:33 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order on Motion to Extend Time-Adversary
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
24 24 notice Consent for Electronic Notice and Service (9036) Wed 08/14 8:45 AM
Consent for Electronic Notice and Service Filed by David B. Vindici . (rxc)
Related: [-]
court Email Activated (Public Entry) Wed 08/14 8:48 AM
Court Email Notifications Have Been Activated for David B. Vindici. Text Entry Only. (rxc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
23 23 order Extend Time (Adversary) Tue 08/13 3:41 PM
Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time Related [+]. Document due by 8/27/2024 for22 . (dmu)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Extend Time
Monday, August 12, 2024
22 22 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Tue 08/13 10:30 AM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by David Vindici on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC , Halo Laboratories, LLC . (rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
21 21 order Extend Time (Adversary) Tue 07/30 9:44 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Obtain Counsel Related [+]. Counsel must enter an appearance by 8/13/2024 for16 . (mlr)
Related: [-] 16 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Thursday, July 25, 2024
20 20 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Thu 07/25 3:28 PM
Motion to Extend Time To Obtain Counsel Filed by David B. Vindici on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 16 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
19 19 misc Document/Discovery or Support Document Thu 07/25 3:26 PM
Declaration Of David B. Vindici On Behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC . (rxc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/05 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/05 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
16 16 order Compliance With Rules Wed 07/03 11:47 AM
Order Directing Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-1(E) Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 7/26/2024 for1 , (rxc)
Related: [-] quired Representation Of A Corporation, Partnership, Or Other Unincorporated Organization, Or Entity1 Complaint,15 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
15 15 order Withdraw As Attorney Wed 07/03 11:41 AM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Kutner Brinen Dickey Riley, P.C. Jeffrey S. Brinen and Jenny M.F. Fujii Terminated. Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Tue 07/02 2:38 PM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Jenny M.F. Fujii on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC, Halo Laboratories, LLC Related [+]. (Fujii, Jenny)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 notice 9013-1.1 Notice Tue 06/25 12:06 PM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Jeffrey S. Brinen on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC , Halo Laboratories, LLC Related [+]. 9013 Objections due by 7/1/2024 for12 , (saa)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
12 12 motion Withdraw As Attorney Mon 06/24 3:35 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Jeffrey S. Brinen on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC, Halo Laboratories, LLC. (Brinen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, June 13, 2024
11 11 order Compliance With Rules Thu 06/13 11:17 AM
Order Regarding Compliance With Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7026 (Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) and (f)). Related [+]. Written Report due by 7/30/2024 for1 , (saa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/12 4:13 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by George D. Bruntz on behalf of James Alfred Tindall Related [+]. (Bruntz, George)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Tue 05/28 12:20 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Filed by Jenny M.F. Fujii on behalf of Halo Laboratories, LLC. (Fujii, Jenny)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Tue 05/28 12:19 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Filed by Jenny M.F. Fujii on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC. (Fujii, Jenny)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Tue 05/28 12:03 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Jenny Fujii is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 6: A proposed order was not submitted with the motion . E-Filer shall email a proposed order in PDF format to cob_proposedorders@cob.uscourts.gov. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. Tickle Due Date 6/4/2024. (saa)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend Time
Friday, May 24, 2024
6 6 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Fri 05/24 4:32 PM
Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To to file Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Jenny M.F. Fujii on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC, Halo Laboratories, LLC. (Fujii, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
5 5 order File Mon 05/20 11:00 AM
Order to File Corporate Ownership Statements Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7007.1(a). Related [+]. Document due by 5/28/2024 for1 , (saa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 05/14 9:43 AM
Summons Service Executed On: May 14, 2024 Filed by Jeffrey S. Brinen on behalf of Green Earth Technologies, LLC, Halo Laboratories, LLC. (Brinen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 05/14 9:32 AM
Summons Issued on James Alfred Tindall Answer Due 06/13/2024. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Brinen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 05/13 5:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-01105 JGR] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32773290. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/13 5:32 PM
Adversary case 24-01105 Complaint by Green Earth Technologies, LLC, Halo Laboratories, LLC against James Alfred Tindall. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 08/12/2024 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Brinen, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]