Utah District Court
Judge:Ted Stewart
Referred: Jared C Bennett
Case #: 2:24-cv-00343
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:0271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Case in other court:Delaware, 1:23-cv-00851
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 1:54 AM MST
Defendant
Owlet Inc.
Represented By
Brian N. Platt
Workman Nydegger
contact info
Plaintiff
Portus Pty Ltd.
Represented By
Manoj S. Gandhi
contact info
Michele M. Myer
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.
Represented By
Manoj S. Gandhi
contact info
Michele M. Myer
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, November 25, 2024
40 40 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/25 5:05 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Owlet Inc.. (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/01 12:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Owlet Inc.. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 11/01 2:05 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Owlet Inc. Defendant Owlet Inc. shall have up to and including November 25, 2024, to file a reply in support of 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/01/2024.(docket text order; no attached document). (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
37 37 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/28 6:15 PM
Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (Gandhi, Manoj)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
36 36 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 09/30 6:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Owlet Inc..(Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from'526 Patent File History
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
35 35 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/27 10:20 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) for Patent Infringement against Owlet Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Portus Singapore Pte Ltd., Portus Pty Ltd.. (Gandhi, Manoj) Modified on 8/27/2024-Same as30 . Stricken as duplicative. (jrj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 8,914,526,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - US Patent 9,961,097,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Letter to Owlet 11-29-2016
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 08/27 10:13 AM
ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 30 Amended Complaint, . Answer deadline updated for Owlet Inc. answer due 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/27/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 08/26 5:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re30 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Owlet Inc.. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 22, 2024
31 31 motion Leave to File Document Thu 08/22 3:48 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Unopposed) filed by Plaintiffs Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Gandhi, Manoj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Redlined Version of Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 08/22 4:52 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER finding as moot 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 31 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/22/2024. No attached document. (tlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/15 2:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) for Patent Infringement against Owlet Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Portus Singapore Pte Ltd., Portus Pty Ltd.. (Gandhi, Manoj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 8,914,526,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - US Patent 9,961,097,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Letter to Owlet 11-29-2016
Thursday, July 25, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 07/25 1:44 PM
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the court HEREBY ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall have up to and including August 15, 2024 to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/25/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time Thu 07/25 12:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs to file Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 27) filed by Plaintiffs Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Myer, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/27 5:20 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Owlet Inc.. Attorney Brian N. Platt added to party Owlet Inc.(pty:dft)(Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice letter from Portus,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from'526 Patent File History
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/05 1:47 PM
ORDER granting 25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Manoj S. Gandhi for Portus Pty Ltd.,Manoj S. Gandhi for Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/5/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Wed 06/05 1:15 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Manoj S. Gandhi , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5083665, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiffs Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd..(Myer, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
24 24 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 05/28 1:45 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 5/28/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/28 10:27 AM
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Owlet Inc. shall have until June 27, 2024, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/28/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/28 1:08 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 05/28/2024. (maa)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/24 3:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd..(Myer, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/24 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michele M. Myer on behalf of Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. (Myer, Michele)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/24 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Miller on behalf of Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. (Miller, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
18 18 misc Report Regarding Patent and Trademark Tue 05/14 2:14 PM
Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice PHV Requirements Tue 05/14 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice emailed to attorney Stamatios Stamoulis and Richard Charles Weinblatt for Portus Pty Ltd. (mh)
Related: [-]
16 16 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 05/14 1:44 PM
Case transferred in from USDC of Delaware; Case Number 1:23-cv-00851. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. USDC District of UT assigned to Judge Ted Stewart, Case Number 2:24-cv-00343.
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
15 15 SO ORDERED, granting14 Stipulation to Transfer Case to District of Utah. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/13/2024. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
14 14 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to District of Utah by Owlet Inc.. (Palapura, Bindu) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
13 13 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to any including summary judgment, subject to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and any further order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 23-851-JLH-CJB. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/3/2024. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Remark: The parties should follow the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, a copy of which is found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's webpage:[LINK:https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/CJBCC2022.pdf] Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00851-JLH-CJB, 1:23-cv-00976-JLH-CJB, 1:23-cv-00977-JLH-CJB(smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Remark: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:[LINK:http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf] Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00851-JLH-CJB, 1:23-cv-00976-JLH-CJB, 1:23-cv-00977-JLH-CJB(smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
12 12 SO ORDERED, granting11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 28, 2024. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Owlet Inc. answer due 5/28/2024). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/22/2024. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
11 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 28, 2024 - filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. (Weinblatt, Richard) Modified docket text/recoded event on 3/22/2024 (ceg). [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
SO ORDERED, granting10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Owlet Inc. answer due 3/29/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/23/2024. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
10 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, - filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (Weinblatt, Richard) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
Case Reassigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00851-RGA, 1:23-cv-00976-RGA, 1:23-cv-00977-RGA(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
SO ORDERED, re9 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Owlet Inc. answer due 1/29/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/30/2023. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
9 9 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time - filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 10/30/2023 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
SO ORDERED, granting8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Owlet Inc. answer due 10/29/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2023. (lah) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
8 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time - filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 8/30/2023 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
SO ORDERED, re7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manoj Gandhi, filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/11/2023. (lah) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
7 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Manoj Gandhi - filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.. (Weinblatt, Richard) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Portus Singapore Pte Ltd., Portus Pty Ltd..Owlet Inc. served on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. (Weinblatt, Richard) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
5 5 Summons Issued as to Owlet Inc. on 8/7/2023. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
4 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. for Portus Pty Ltd. filed by Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,914,526 B1; US 9,961,097 B2. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Owlet Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4195380.) - filed by Portus Singapore Pte Ltd., Portus Pty Ltd.(smg) [Transferred from Delaware on 5/14/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet