Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:24-cv-00512
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 3:09 AM CST
Defendant
Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC
Represented By
Michael B. Johnson
Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP
contact info
Defendant
Citizens Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Jared C. Lampson
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Audrey Altstatt
Represented By
Tyler Hickle
Law Office Of Tyler Hickle, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
21 21 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 04/23 11:09 AM
ORDER GRANTING Defendant Abbott Osborn Jacobs, PLC's13 Motion to Dismiss with LEAVE TO AMEND . Plaintiff may amend her complaint no later than May 20, 2025 to address the deficiencies in her pleadings as discussed in this Order. Failure to do so will result in the Court's dismissal of these claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
20 20 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/23 11:05 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2025, Discovery due by 9/24/2025, Joinder of Parties due by 5/14/2025, and Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2025. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 03/24 2:20 PM
Scheduling Recommendations by Audrey Altstatt. (Hickle, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 03/17 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Tyler Hickle (Hickle, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 11/27 6:00 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC, re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/20 3:58 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Audrey Altstatt, re13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC (Hickle, Tyler)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/20 8:47 AM
Text Order GRANTING15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KClc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/18 11:18 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Audrey Altstatt. (Hickle, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 11/07 4:43 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 11/01 2:53 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC.(Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 31, 2024
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 10/31 10:03 AM
Text Order MOOTING10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the amended complaint, (Dkt. 11), IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 10/29 10:18 AM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Lampson, Jared)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/18 3:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending1 Complaint., filed by Audrey Altstatt.(Hickle, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/04 4:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC.(Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/26 10:49 AM
Text Order GRANTING9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 4, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 09/26 4:06 PM
Reset Deadline: Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC answer due by 10/4/2024. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/25 2:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC.(Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/25 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael B. Johnson on behalf of Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC. Attorney Michael B. Johnson added to party Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC(pty:dft) (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/09 10:12 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Lampson, Jared)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/16 10:40 AM
Text Order GRANTING5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Citizens Bank, N.A. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 9, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sslc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 08/19 8:07 AM
Reset Deadlines: Citizens Bank, N.A. answer due 9/9/2024. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Thu 08/15 9:35 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Citizens Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citizens Financial Group, Inc. for Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Lampson, Jared)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/15 9:27 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Lampson, Jared)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint
Monday, June 24, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/24 10:04 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Audrey Altstatt as to Citizens Bank, N.A.. Waiver sent on 6/18/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. (Hickle, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/15 8:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Abbott Osborn Jacobs PLC, Citizens Bank, N.A.. (kp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/14 3:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Audrey Altstatt. (Hickle, Tyler)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/14 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18761565), filed by Audrey Altstatt.(Hickle, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/15 8:22 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 05/15 8:23 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 05/15 8:25 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Audrey Altstatt. (kp)
Related: [-]