California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-04025
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
Amanda L. Neville
Represented By
Rolando Javellana Tong
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tipsy, LLC
Represented By
Rolando Javellana Tong
Manning And Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Genki Ito
Represented By
R. Joseph Trojan
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Francis Wong
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Lan C Dang
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Tippsy, Inc.
Represented By
R. Joseph Trojan
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Francis Wong
Trojan Law Offices
contact info
Lan C Dang
Trojan Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
34 34 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Wed 12/18 11:14 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 24-7587 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,31 as to Plaintiff Tippsy, Inc., Genki Ito. (mat)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 12/17 4:49 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yury A Kolesnikov counsel for Defendants Tipsy, LLC, Amanda L. Neville. Adding Yury A. Kolesnikov as counsel of record for Defendants Tipsy, LLC and Amanda L. Neville for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Tipsy, LLC and Amanda L. Neville. (Attorney Yury A Kolesnikov added to party Tipsy, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Yury A Kolesnikov added to party Amanda L. Neville(pty:dft))(Kolesnikov, Yury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
32 32 appeal Representation Statement Wed 12/11 11:35 AM
REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,31 . (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
31 31 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Wed 12/11 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiffs Tippsy, Inc., Genki Ito. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction29 . (Appeal Fee - $605.00 Previously Paid on 12/11/2024, Receipt No. ACACDC-38735330.) (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
30 30 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Thu 11/14 1:36 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 11/14 1:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION16 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court GRANTS defendants Defendants' motion. The action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
28 28 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 09/18 9:41 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (rolm)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 09/18 9:40 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2025 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 10/14/2025. Motion in Limine set for hearing on 10/6/2025 at 01:30 PM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
26 26 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 09/16 3:21 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Genki Ito, Tippsy, Inc... (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
25 25 order Continue Tue 09/10 3:07 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Having considered Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Continuance of the Scheduling Conference and Its Associated Deadlines (the "Motion to Continue")23 , and Plaintiffs' Opposition, (ECF No. 24), the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Continue. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
24 24 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 09/09 3:36 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 23, 2024 to November 18, 202423 filed by Plaintiffs Genki Ito, Tippsy, Inc..(Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Trojan in support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
23 23 motion Continue Mon 09/09 12:29 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 23, 2024 to November 18, 2024 filed by Defendants Amanda L. Neville, Tipsy, LLC. (Tong, Rolando)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
22 22 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 08/13 11:21 AM
The hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss16 , scheduled for August 19, 2024 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
21 21 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 08/05 11:46 AM
REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 16 filed by Defendants Amanda L. Neville, Tipsy, LLC. (Tong, Rolando)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
20 20 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 07/29 2:31 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 16 filed by Plaintiffs Genki Ito, Tippsy, Inc..(Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration OF R. JOSEPH TROJAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Trojan Decl.
Friday, July 19, 2024
19 19 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 07/19 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Tong, Rolando)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
18 18 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 07/18 1:54 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Defendants Amanda L. Neville, Tipsy, LLC's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
17 17 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 07/18 12:01 PM
ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for September 23, 2024 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 07/17 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendants Amanda L. Neville, Tipsy, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Tong, Rolando)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 06/26 1:16 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amanda L. Neville answer now due 7/17/2024; Tipsy, LLC answer now due 7/17/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendants Amanda L. Neville; Tipsy, LLC.(Attorney Rolando Javellana Tong added to party Amanda L. Neville(pty:dft), Attorney Rolando Javellana Tong added to party Tipsy, LLC(pty:dft))(Tong, Rolando)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 06/10 2:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tippsy, Inc., Genki Ito, upon Defendant Amanda L. Neville served on 6/7/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maggie Tiller, Manager/co-worker in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 06/10 2:14 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tippsy, Inc., Genki Ito, upon Defendant Tipsy, LLC served on 6/5/2024, answer due 6/26/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maggie Tiller, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 05/16 11:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submitdocuments electronically to the Clerks Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Courts Website and Judges procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/15 3:42 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Amanda L. Neville. (car)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/15 3:39 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Tipsy, LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 05/15 3:31 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 05/15 3:31 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 05/15 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
6 6 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Tue 05/14 3:17 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Genki Ito, Tippsy, Inc.. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 05/14 3:10 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Genki Ito, Tippsy, Inc., identifying Tippsy, Inc., Genki Ito, Tipsy, LLC, and Amanda L. Neville. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 05/14 3:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Genki Ito, Tippsy, Inc.. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 05/14 3:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiffs Genki Ito, Tippsy, Inc.. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Tue 05/14 3:01 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiffs Genki Ito, Tippsy, Inc.. (Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/14 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37467826 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Tippsy, Inc., Genki Ito. (Attorney R. Joseph Trojan added to party Genki Ito(pty:pla), Attorney R. Joseph Trojan added to party Tippsy, Inc.(pty:pla))(Trojan, R.)
Related: [-]