Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Case #: 3:24-cv-01221
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 4:52 AM AST
Defendant
Anibal Centeno-Rosario
Represented By
Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo
Puerto Rico Departament Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Cristina Cruz-Villegas
Represented By
Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo
Puerto Rico Departament Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Jose Pagan-Cardona
Represented By
Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo
Puerto Rico Departament Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Frances De La Rosa
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Johanna Delgado-Rodriguez
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
FLR
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
JJMD
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Osvaldo Lopez
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
MATR
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Melendez-Velez
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Maribel Rodriguez-Rosello
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilfredo Tristani-Cruz
Represented By
Richard Schell-Asad
Richard Schell-Asad, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, November 22, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/22 10:19 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo on behalf of Anibal Centeno-Rosario, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Jose Pagan-Cardona.(Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
24 24 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/20 3:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/20/2024. Present were counsel Richard Schell-Asad on behalf of plaintiffs and counsel Diana Perez-Carlo on behalf of defendant. Case background, status, and all outstanding issues were discussed. As to settlement, the parties informed that no settlement conversations have taken place. The Court informed the parties that the pending Motion to Dismiss will be addressed but the case cannot be stayed pending ruling on said motion and they should continue with discovery. After having heard the parties, the Court adopted the recommended discovery deadlines proposed by the parties in the Joint Initial Scheduling Memorandum filed at Dkt. No.21 with additional settings: Discovery to conclude by 5/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2025. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2025. Replies and sur-replies will be allowed. They should be submitted without further Court authorization not later than five (5) days after filing of the motion they are responding to. A Status/Settlement Conference is set for 6/10/2025 at 01:30 PM in Hato Rey Courtroom 2 before Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Principals shall attend the conference or be available by phone. (Court Reporter N/A.) (Hearing held in Hato Rey Courtroom 2.) (mr)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/20 9:46 AM
ORDER noting and granting22 Motion for Extension of Time until November 22, 2024 to File Answer. Answer to Complaint due by 11/22/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 11/20/2024. (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/15 5:50 PM
Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time until November 22, 2024 to File Answer filed by Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo on behalf of Anibal Centeno-Rosario, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Jose Pagan-Cardona. Responses due by 11/29/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
21 21 misc Initial Scheduling Conference Memorandum Thu 11/14 4:20 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by Anibal Centeno-Rosario, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Jose Pagan-Cardona. (Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 11/14 2:19 PM
ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2024, WILL BE HELD at 09:30 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 2 before Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 11/14/2024. (mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/22 1:16 PM
ORDER. Parties are notified that discovery is not stayed pending Defendants':15 "Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim." Defendants must file an Answer to the Complaint by 11/7/2024. Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 11/20/2024 at 11:00 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 2 before Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Joint Initial Scheduling Memorandum due by 11/14/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/22/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
18 18 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/24 4:25 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re:15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jose Pagan-Cardona, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Anibal Centeno-Rosario filed by All Plaintiffs. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 09/19 2:51 PM
ORDER granting:16 "Motion for Extension of Time." Responsive pleading due by 9/27/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 9/19/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time Thu 09/19 11:31 AM
MOTION for extension of time until September 27, 2024 to Oppose Motion to Dismiss, dkt. no. 15 filed by Richard Schell-Asad on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/3/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 09/05 5:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo on behalf of Anibal Centeno-Rosario, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Jose Pagan-Cardona. Responses due by 9/19/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/23 5:21 PM
ORDER granting:13 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." This is the third extension request. Defendants are warned that no further extensions will be granted. Responsive pleading due by 9/6/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 8/23/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/23 3:21 PM
Final MOTION for Extension of Time until Septemeber 6, 2024 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo on behalf of Anibal Centeno-Rosario, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Jose Pagan-Cardona. Responses due by 9/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 07/29 9:42 AM
ORDER granting:11 "Second Motion for Extension of Time." Responsive Pleading due by 8/23/2024. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 7/29/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time Wed 07/24 3:18 PM
Second MOTION for extension of time until August 23, 2024 to file answer or otherwise plead filed by Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo on behalf of Anibal Centeno-Rosario, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Jose Pagan-Cardona. Responses due by 8/7/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 06/25 9:42 AM
ORDER granting:9 "Motion for Extension of Time." Responsive pleading due by 7/24/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 6/25/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/24 10:45 AM
MOTION for extension of time until July 24, 2024 to file answer or otherwise plead filed by Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo on behalf of Anibal Centeno-Rosario, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Jose Pagan-Cardona. Responses due by 7/8/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/18 4:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Anibal Centeno-Rosario served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/18 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Jose Pagan-Cardona served on 6/3/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/18 4:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Cristina Cruz-Villegas served on 6/3/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Schell-Asad, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/10 11:45 AM
ORDER granting:4 "Motion for Extension of Time until July 10 2024 to File Answer or Plead." Responsive pleading due by 7/10/2024. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 6/10/2024. (ao)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/10 10:45 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until July 10 2024 to File Answer or Plead filed by Diana Itzel Perez-Carlo on behalf of Anibal Centeno-Rosario Responses due by 6/24/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Carlo, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/15 11:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Anibal Centeno-Rosario, Cristina Cruz-Villegas, Jose Pagan-Cardona. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 05/15 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/14 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8670373.), filed by FLR, JJMD, Wilfredo Tristani-Cruz, MATR, Johanna Delgado-Rodriguez, Maribel Rodriguez-Rosello, Osvaldo Lopez, Jose Melendez-Velez, Frances De La Rosa. Service due by 8/12/2024,(Schell-Asad, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Initializing Docs and Three Summons