Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:24-cv-01146
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 3:10 AM CST
Defendant
Danny Yoo
Plaintiff
PNC Bank National Association
Represented By
Gabriella Elise Alonso
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Joshua Abraham Lesser
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
15 15 order Judgment Mon 05/05 1:50 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that default judgment is entered in favor of PNC Bank against Danny Yoo, and PNC Bank shall recover the following from Yoo: monetary damages of $689,080.13; attorney's fees in the amount of $14,784.50; court costs in the amount of $650.17; and post-judgment interest at the applicable federal rate from the date of this judgment until paid in full. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/5/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Mon 05/05 1:44 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING13 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/5/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 motion Findings and Recommendations Mon 04/07 9:36 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The District Judge should GRANT the9 Motion for Default Judgment and allow PNC Bank to recover from Yoo monetary damages of $689,080.13; attorneys fees in the amount of $14,784.50; court costs in the amount of $650.17; and post judgment interest at the applicable federal rate from the date of final judgment until paid in full. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 4/4/2025) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
12 12 order Order Referring Motion Tue 09/17 9:04 AM
ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion re:9 MOTION for Default Judgment against Danny Yoo Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/17/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
11 11 misc Court Request For Recusal Tue 09/17 6:36 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge Horan recused. Pursuant to instructions in Special Order 3-249, Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford has been chosen by random selection to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (cea)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Referring Motion Mon 09/16 11:21 AM
ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion re:9 MOTION for Default Judgment against Danny Yoo Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/16/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/06 5:18 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Danny Yoo filed by PNC Bank National Association (Lesser, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A-2,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) B-1,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C-1,
Att: 8 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Default,
Att: 9 Proposed Default Judgment
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
8 8 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 08/29 10:11 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Danny Yoo. (ndt)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Wed 08/28 4:26 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by PNC Bank National Association. (Lesser, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Thu 08/08 12:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Danny Yoo ; served on 8/6/2024. (Lesser, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 05/15 3:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Danny Yoo. (kcr)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Wed 05/15 12:07 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by PNC Bank National Association. (Lesser, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 05/15 11:45 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PNC Bank National Association. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Lesser, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
2 2 qcref Brown Wed 05/15 8:56 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/14 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Danny Yoo filed by PNC Bank, National Association, as successor-in-interest to BBVA USA. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14616966) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lesser, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet