Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 3:24-cv-00381
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Terminated:Sep 04, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/18 10:31 AM
Mail Returned from Derek Lee Jones as Undeliverable -7 Order Dismissing Case,8 Clerks Judgment. Envelope marked - Not in Custody, Return to Sender. (sej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
8 8 misc Clerks Judgment Thu 09/05 2:04 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/05 1:59 PM
ORDER: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 9/4/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 07/30 12:52 PM
Mail Returned from Derek Lee Jones as Undeliverable -5 Order to Show Cause. Envelope marked - Not in Custody, Return to Sender, Attempted- Not Known. (sej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 07/17 3:05 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS Derek Lee Jones to either pay the entire remaining balance of the filing fee ($350.00) or provide a written explanation showing cause why he has not paid the initial partial filing fee and any required installment payments WITH a copy of his inmate ledger showing every transaction since 5/16/2024. The Court CAUTIONS Mr. Jones that if he does not respond by 8/14/2024, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/17/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
4 4 misc Letter Tue 06/11 7:15 AM
Letter from Derek Lee Jones requesting to amend complaint. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Page 1 of Amended Complaint
Thursday, May 16, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/16 3:24 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Derek Lee Jones, IDOC # UNKNOWN, St. Joseph County Jail # 316097, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $35.00 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Gretchen S Lund on 5/16/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party and St. Joseph County Jail)(ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/14 3:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Derek Lee Jones. (nae)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Tue 05/14 3:53 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against South Bend Police Department, St Joseph County Jail, filed by Derek Lee Jones. Related [+](nae)
Related: [-] turned file stamped copy with case number to plaintiff
Att: 1 Envelope