Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Referred: Brian W Mckay
Case #: 3:24-cv-01149
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:23-cv-01301
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 2:53 AM CST
Claimant
PRO SE Samantha Diann Sanford
801 Willowbrook Dr
Mesquite, TX 75149
Counter Claimant
Samantha Diann Sanford
Represented By
John Henry Wickert
John H. Wickert
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mercedes Contreras
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Charles A Whobrey
Represented By
Francis J Carey
Francis J Carey
contact info
Counter Defendant
Norma Hernandez
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Norma Hernandez
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Mercedes Contreras
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Samantha Diann Sanford
801 Willowbrook Dr.
Mesquite, TX 75149
Represented By
John Henry Wickert
John H. Wickert
contact info
Cross Defendant
Norma Hernandez
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Charles A Whobrey
Represented By
Francis J Carey
Francis J Carey
contact info
Francis Joseph Carey
Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension & Health
contact info
Cross Defendant
Mercedes Contreras
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Samantha Diann Sanford
801 Willowbrook Dr.
Mesquite, TX 75149
Represented By
John Henry Wickert
John H. Wickert
contact info
Defendant
Norma Hernandez
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mercedes Contreras
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Samantha Diann Sanford
801 Willowbrook Dr.
Mesquite, TX 75149
Represented By
John Henry Wickert
John H. Wickert
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles A Whobrey
Represented By
Francis J Carey
Francis J Carey
contact info
Francis Joseph Carey
Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension & Health
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Charles A Whobrey
Represented By
Francis J Carey
Francis J Carey
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Norma Hernandez
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Mercedes Contreras
Represented By
Bradley Alan Skafish
Deutschman & Skafish, PC
contact info
Rwan Saffarini Hardesty
Atrium Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Deutschman & Skafish, P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Samantha Diann Sanford
Represented By
John Henry Wickert
John H. Wickert
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Central States Health & Welfare Fund
Terminated: 01/09/2024
8647 West Higgins Road
Chicago, IL 60631
Represented By
Francis J Carey
Francis J Carey
contact info
Timothy Craig Reuter
Central States Funds
contact info
Francis Joseph Carey
Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension & Health
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
85 85 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/20 9:16 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2025. Discovery due by 3/31/2025. Motions due by 4/30/2025. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 11/19/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]