Oregon District Court
Judge:Karin J Immergut
Case #: 3:24-cv-00799
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Case in other court:Clackamas County Justice Court, 24FE0426
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 12:50 AM PST
Defendant
Bryan Griggs
PO Box 1434
Lake Oswego, OR 97035
Defendant
Rebecca Jackson
Plaintiff
Cambridge Real Estate Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
Oswego Gardens JP, LLC


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Monday, July 15, 2024
14 14 appeal Mandate of USCA Thu 07/18 10:09 AM
MANDATE of USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 24-3410 , re Notice of Appeal11 . The appeal is dismissed. (ecp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
13 13 1 pgs appeal Order of Dismissal of Appeal by USCA Mon 06/24 12:22 PM
Order of USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 24-3410 , re Notice of Appeal11 . The appeal is dismissed. A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not reviewable. See 28 U.S.C. § 1447(d); Kunzi v. Pan Am. World Airways, Inc., 833 F.2d 1291, 1293 (9th Cir. 1987) (order remanding a removed action to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is not reviewable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED (ecp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 05/30 3:31 PM
USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal11 . Case Appealed to Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 24-3410 assigned. (ecp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
12 12 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Wed 05/29 11:25 AM
Certificate for Emergency Motion. Filed by Bryan Griggs. (sb)
Related: [-]
11 11 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 05/29 11:21 AM
Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Related Documents: Order6 . (No IFP Granted and No Fee Paid). Filed by Bryan Griggs. (sb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Transmittal of Case to State Court Mon 05/20 9:54 AM
Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet and certified copy of Order6 to Clackamas County Justice Court, Case No. 24FE0426. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/20/24.) (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/20 1:06 PM
Certificate of Service by Bryan Griggs of Declaration9 . Filed by Bryan Griggs. (dino)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_sup Declaration Mon 05/20 1:04 PM
Declaration of Bryan Griggs in Support of Emergency Motion3 . Filed by Bryan Griggs. (dino)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
7 7 service Certificate of Service Mon 05/20 9:52 AM
Certificate of Service by Bryan Griggs Filed by Bryan Griggs. (sb)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 3:22 PM
ORDER: Because there is no basis for original jurisdiction and this Court is barred from hearing a de facto appeal from a state court judgment, this Court lacks jurisdiction over this action. Removal is improper. This action is REMANDED to the Clackamas County Justice Court. All other outstanding motions, ECFs2 ,3 , are DENIED as moot. See attached Order for details. Signed on 5/15/2024 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/16/24.) (jy)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Wed 05/15 10:54 AM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Karin J. Immergut. NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL : This case has been removed to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the Clackamas County Justice Court. Our records indicate that one or more attorneys appearing on the case are not admitted to practice or are admitted only pro hac vice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by[LINK:LR 83] , and information about the process is available on the[LINK:admissions page] of the Court website. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 5/15/24.) (eo)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_sup Declaration Wed 05/15 10:52 AM
Declaration of Bryan Griggs in Support of Notice of Removal (#1 ) and Emergency Motion (#3 ). Filed by Bryan Griggs. (eo)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs motion Order Wed 05/15 10:51 AM
Emergency Motion. Filed by Bryan Griggs. (eo)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Wed 05/15 10:49 AM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Bryan Griggs. (eo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/15 10:47 AM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 24FE0426 from Clackamas County Justice Court.. Filed by Bryan Griggs.. (eo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet