Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-00669
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 12:37 AM PST
Defendant
Helen L Halpert
Represented By
Bradley S Keller
Byrnes Keller Cromwell LLP
contact info
Paul R Taylor
Byrnes Keller Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
JAMS Mediation Arbitration and ADR Services
Represented By
Bradley S Keller
Byrnes Keller Cromwell LLP
contact info
Paul R Taylor
Byrnes Keller Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
State of Washington
Represented By
Dana Savage
Attorney General'S Office (lic)
contact info
Defendant
Bob Ferguson
Represented By
Dana Savage
Attorney General'S Office (lic)
contact info
Plaintiff
John Torsten Loop
E-filing/Service 734 10TH AVE E
SEATTLE, WA 98102


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 15, 2024
39 39 appeal Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA Fri 08/16 8:52 AM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 24-5020 as to38 Notice of Appeal filed by John Torsten Loop. (RE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
38 38 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Tue 08/13 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re37 Judgment by Court,36 Order, by Plaintiff John Torsten Loop. $605, receipt number AWAWDC-8584446 (cc: USCA) (Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
37 37 order Judgment by Court Thu 08/08 10:59 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted, and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (SB)
Related: [-]
36 36 order 1 - Order Thu 08/08 10:59 AM
ORDER granting Defendants'16 26 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's cross-motions and motion for discovery are DENIED as moot. Dkt. Nos.19 ,29 ,32 . Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Response to Motion Thu 08/08 10:48 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Helen L Halpert, JAMS Mediation Arbitration and ADR Services, to32 MOTION for Discovery . (Taylor, Paul)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Response to Motion Thu 08/08 10:08 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Bob Ferguson, State of Washington, to32 MOTION for Discovery .(Savage, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 25, 2024
33 33 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Thu 07/25 8:43 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Thu 07/25 8:09 AM
Noting Date Set/Reset re Plaintiff's32 MOTION for Discovery. Noted by clerk for 8/14/2024. (SB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
32 32 motion Discovery Wed 07/24 3:00 PM
MOTION for Discovery , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 7/26/2024, (Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS,
Att: 2 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO PROCEED WITH DISCOVERY
Monday, July 22, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/22 3:50 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Bob Ferguson, State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to26 MOTION to Dismiss (Savage, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 07/03 12:53 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Helen L Halpert, JAMS Mediation Arbitration and ADR Services, TO RESPONSE to16 MOTION to Dismiss (Taylor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
29 29 motion Cross Motion Tue 07/02 10:54 AM
CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re26 MOTION to Dismiss ,16 MOTION to Dismiss ,19 CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re16 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff John Torsten Loop. Noting Date 7/22/2024, (Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Updated Restraining Order Injunction,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Updated Apology Letter to Child Injunctive Relief
28 28 respm Affidavit Tue 07/02 10:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT of FACTS filed by Plaintiff John Torsten Loop re26 MOTION to Dismiss ,16 MOTION to Dismiss ,19 CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re16 MOTION to Dismiss (Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
27 27 respm Declaration Mon 06/24 6:20 PM
DECLARATION of Dana M. Savage filed by Defendants Bob Ferguson, State of Washington re26 MOTION to Dismiss(Savage, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit #1
26 26 motion Dismiss Mon 06/24 6:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Bob Ferguson, State of Washington. Noting Date 7/22/2024, (Savage, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Friday, June 21, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/21 10:37 AM
ORDER granting Defendants'14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Request for Injunction. Defendants Ferguson and the State of Washington may respond to Loop's complaint no later than 6/24/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 06/21 8:30 AM
REPLY, filed by Defendants Bob Ferguson, State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Request for Injunction (Savage, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
23 23 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Tue 06/18 10:07 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on JAMS ADR on 6/4/2024, filed by Plaintiff John Torsten Loop.(Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service PROOF OF SERVICE
22 22 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Tue 06/18 10:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Helen Halpert on 6/4/2024, filed by Plaintiff John Torsten Loop.(Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service PROOF OF SERVICE
Monday, June 17, 2024
21 21 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Mon 06/17 9:26 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 06/14 8:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
19 19 motion Cross Motion Tue 06/11 7:58 AM
CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re16 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff John Torsten Loop. Noting Date 7/5/2024, (Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed order invalidating restraining order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed order apology letter to child
Friday, June 07, 2024
18 18 misc Request Fri 06/07 6:11 PM
REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Defendants Helen L Halpert, JAMS Mediation Arbitration and ADR Services for Judicial Notice re16 MOTION to Dismiss(Taylor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Request for Judicial Notice
17 17 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 06/07 5:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Helen L Halpert, JAMS Mediation Arbitration and ADR Services. (Taylor, Paul)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Fri 06/07 5:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Helen L Halpert, JAMS Mediation Arbitration and ADR Services. Noting Date 7/5/2024, (Taylor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
15 15 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/07 4:26 PM
RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Request for Injunction .(Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit WA State Equity Considerations,
Att: 2 Exhibit WA MOU,
Att: 3 Exhibit WA Research Study,
Att: 4 Exhibit WA Service Waiver
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 06/07 12:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Request for Injunction , filed by Defendants Bob Ferguson, State of Washington. Noting Date 6/21/2024, (Savage, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting State Def's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thursday, June 06, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/06 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bradley S Keller on behalf of Defendants Helen L Halpert, JAMS Mediation Arbitration and ADR Services. (Keller, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
12 12 misc Consent Letter & Form Wed 06/05 1:15 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM. If consent or decline, return the executed form by 6/13/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul R Taylor on behalf of Defendants Helen L Halpert, JAMS Mediation Arbitration and ADR Services. (Taylor, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana Savage on behalf of Defendants Bob Ferguson, State of Washington. (Savage, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 05/28 9:50 AM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to All Defendants. (AQ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JAMS,
Att: 2 Helen Halpert
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Wed 05/22 11:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant State of Washington mailed on 5/17/2024(Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Waiver and acknoledgement of service
7 7 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 05/22 11:40 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on JAMS, Helen Halpert on 5/17/2024, filed by Plaintiff John Torsten Loop.(Loop, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service JAMS,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service Halpert
Thursday, May 16, 2024
6 6 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 7:44 AM
COMPLAINT for Violations of Civil Rights and Request for Injunction against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) Related [+] filed by John Torsten Loop.(Loop, John)
Related: [-] ceipt # 200004792
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Restraining Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B JAMS agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Hearing Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D Superior Court Order Motion Not Granted,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E Motion for Reconsideration and Partial Narrative Award,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F JAMS Comprehensive Rules and Procedures,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G JAMS email,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H Appellant Brief
5 5 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 6:53 AM
COMPLAINT Complaint for Violations of Civil Rights and Request for Injunction against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) Related [+] filed by John Torsten Loop.(Loop, John)
Related: [-] ceipt # 200004792
Att: 1 Summons Washington State,
Att: 2 Summons JAMS Mediation, Arbitration and ADR Services,
Att: 3 Summons Helen Halpert
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
4 4 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Wed 05/15 1:57 PM
NOTICE: Plaintiff John Torsten Loop has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (LH)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Wed 05/15 10:50 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Redaction, Summons Form Incomplete. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KS) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
2 2 sealdoc Sealed Document Wed 05/15 10:35 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits to Complaint filed by Plaintiff John Torsten Loop re1 Complaint. Sealed administratively due to personal identifiers. (KS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/15 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Summonses as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) Related [+] filed by John Torsten Loop. (KS)
Related: [-] ceipt # 200004792
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Email Transmission of Case