Maryland District Court
Judge:Brendan Abell Hurson
Case #: 1:24-cv-01417
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
Bravura Information Technology Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Elyse Lorin Strickland
Mcmillian Metro PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC
Represented By
John Edward McCann, Jr
Miles And Stockbridge PC
contact info
Patrick Thomas Wilson
Maynard Nexsen PC
contact info
Benjamin L. McArthur
Maynard Nexsen PC
contact info

GPO Jan 06 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 10 Defendant's unopposed motion to strike; striking Paragraphs 13 and 14 of the complaint; striking Exhibit C to the complaint. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 1/6/2025. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
23 23 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 03/18 3:26 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Approving22 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 3/18/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/18 1:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC(McCann, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 order Protective/Confidentiality Order Wed 02/12 11:55 AM
Stipulated MARGINAL ORDER Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 2/12/2025. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation Tue 02/11 1:07 PM
STIPULATION - STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL by Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC(McCann, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, January 06, 2025
19 19 3 pgs order Memorandum and Order Order on Motion to Strike Mon 01/06 11:35 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting10 Defendant's unopposed motion to strike; striking Paragraphs 13 and 14 of the complaint; striking Exhibit C to the complaint. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 1/6/2025. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/20 2:44 PM
SECOND MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/15/2025. Signed by Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 12/20/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Fri 12/20 8:46 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct15 Scheduling Order by Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC(McCann, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/23 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward McCann, Jr on behalf of Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC (McCann, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/10 2:33 PM
Modified SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/5/2024. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 7/10/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 07/08 4:15 PM
STATUS REPORT (Initial Joint) by Bravura Information Technology Systems, Inc.(Strickland, Elyse)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/24 4:47 PM
ORDER outlining informal discovery dispute procedure. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 6/24/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/24 4:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/6/2024. Signed by District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 6/24/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 06/21 5:20 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC (Wilson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Strike Fri 06/21 5:09 PM
MOTION to Strike1 Complaint by Bravura Information Technology Systems, Inc.(Strickland, Elyse)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/21 5:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Bravura Information Technology Systems, Inc..(Strickland, Elyse)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 06/21 5:02 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bravura Information Technology Systems, Inc. (Strickland, Elyse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/04 11:29 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin L. McArthur. Directing attorney Benjamin L. McArthur to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/30 10:26 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin L. McArthur (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11288734.) by Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC(Wilson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/29 3:14 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Brendan Abell Hurson. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
3 3 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Thu 05/16 4:17 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 5/16/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/16 4:17 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Bravura Information Technology Systems, Inc..(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Thu 05/16 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC or counsel for Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/30/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/15 3:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Bravura Information Technology Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11264061.), filed by Beshenich Muir & Associates, LLC.(Wilson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons