Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarala V Nagala
Referred: S Dave Vatti
Case #: 3:24-cv-00882
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 3:19 AM EST
Defendant
K Rowe Associates LLC
Defendant
Patrick Zoellner
Defendant
Laura Zoellner
Defendant
Joel Thompson
Defendant
Srinivasa Talla
Defendant
Jiaye Shen
Defendant
Rahul Patel
Defendant
Vijay Meduri
Defendant
M7 Investment Fund I Limited Liability Company
Defendant
Amit Khanchi
Defendant
Khoa Ho
Defendant
Gregory Dabney
Defendant
DNA Lodging East Hartford, LLC
Defendant
Wes Cardwall
Defendant
Lindsey Cardall
Defendant
Adnan Akhtar
Interested Party
USA
Represented By
Michael S. Bailey
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Julie G. Turbert
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Nh
contact info
Plaintiff
Blais Title & Escrow, LLC
Represented By
William J. Delaney
Lonardo Forte & Trudeau, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Blais Cunningham & Crowe Chester, LLP
Represented By
William J. Delaney
Lonardo Forte & Trudeau, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
64 64 order Order Tue 05/06 12:42 PM
ORDER. Interpleader Plaintiffs have failed to file their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 disclosure statements by April 30, 2025. ECF No. 63. The Court sua sponte extends this deadline to May 12, 2025. Interpleader Plaintiffs shall file their disclosure statements by May 12, 2025 . They shall also provide notice as to why they disregarded the prior deadline by May 12, 2025 . Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 5/6/2025. (Webb, E)
Related: [-]