North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 5:24-cv-00274
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Case in other court:Cumberland County, 24-cvs-2252
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 3:36 AM EST
Defendant
VISA, Inc.
Defendant
Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Gabrielle Mangru Delgado
Mcguire Woods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernest Yarborough
755 Ashfield Drive
Fayetteville, NC 28311


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 13, 2024
11 11 order Judgment Fri 09/13 11:11 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/13/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Memorandum and Recommendations Fri 09/13 11:03 AM
ORDER adopting 9 Memorandum and Recommendation. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [DE 6] is GRANTED. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 9/12/2024. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Wed 09/11 11:25 AM
M&R Submitted to Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II:9 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION regarding6 First MOTION to Dismiss. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
9 9 5 pgs motion Memorandum and Recommendations Mon 08/12 2:55 PM
MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION regarding 6 First MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/12/2024. (Copy of M&R mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
order Order Referring Motion Fri 07/12 4:15 PM
TEXT ORDER: At the direction of the court, the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant [DE 6] is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers to prepare a memorandum and recommendation. Entered by Chief U.S. Judge Richard E. Myers II on 7/12/2024. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 12 Letter Fri 05/24 1:43 PM
Rule 12 Letter Issued as to6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Copy of letter mailed to Plaintiff.) (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Fri 05/24 1:38 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. In future filings, memorandum in support should be filed at a separate docket entry and linked to the corresponding motion. No further action by counsel is required at this time. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
7 7 misc Declaration Wed 05/22 5:26 PM
Declaration regarding6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Delgado, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 05/22 4:45 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Delgado, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Support
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 4:40 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Delgado, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice-other Wed 05/22 1:05 PM
Notice filed by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. 1446 Compliance . (Delgado, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 1:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Gabrielle Mangru Delgado on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Delgado, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
2 2 notice Notice-other Thu 05/16 3:39 PM
Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance, file a Notice of Self-Representation, and file a Financial Disclosure Statement sent Pro Se Plaintiff, Ernest E. Yarborough at 755 Ashfield Dr., Fayetteville, NC 28311 and to Defendant, Visa, Inc. at One Market Plaza, San Francisco, CA 94105 mailed via US Mail on May 16,2024. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure Thu 05/16 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 05/16 3:36 PM
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 05/15 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS, INC. from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number 24CVS2252. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7609414), filed by HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Delgado, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet