Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Colville
Case #: 2:24-cv-00719
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 3:34 AM EST
Defendant
NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By
Katrina M. DeMarte
Demarte Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ODETTE PLETCHER
Represented By
Travis Andrew Gordon
J.P. Ward & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Wed 03/19 6:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ODETTE PLETCHER. (Ward, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order for Administrative Case Closing Fri 07/12 1:24 PM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING: In light of the NOTICE of Settlement11 no further action is required by the Court at this time. The Clerk shall mark the above-captioned case closed. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action, and, that should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, either party may initiate them in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. The Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including, butnot limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/12/24. (cjo)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 07/12 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by ODETTE PLETCHER (Gordon, Travis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 06/26 2:02 PM
ORDER granting9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 COMPLAINT. National Credit Systems, Inc., shall have through and including July 16, 2024, to file its responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/26/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 06/26 12:58 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 COMPLAINT,, filed by ODETTE PLETCHER by NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.. (DeMarte, Katrina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 06/26 12:57 PM
Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.. (DeMarte, Katrina)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina M. DeMarte on behalf of NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.. (DeMarte, Katrina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 06/06 9:20 AM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC. on 6/26/2024 (jd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/05 2:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on National Credit Systems, Inc. on 6/5/2024, filed by ODETTE PLETCHER. (Gordon, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/16 12:36 PM
ORDER re 12(b) Motions. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/16/24. (cjo)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice of ADR Designation Thu 05/16 12:34 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
Related: [-]
3 3 22 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Thu 05/16 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8268331), filed by Odette Pletcher. (Gordon, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Pltf's Identity Theft Reports,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Deft's Collection Letters,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Pltf's Dispute Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Credit Report Tradeline
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/16 9:32 AM
Summons Issued as to NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC. (jd)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Thu 05/16 9:00 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 1 COMPLAINT- ERROR: Error: Filed documents contain Unredacted Personal Identifiers. Correction: Attorney advised to comply with Local Rule 5.2(D) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Wed 05/15 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8267648), filed by Odette Pletcher. (Gordon, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons,
Att: 3 A - Pltf's Identity Theft Reports,
Att: 4 B - Collection Letters sent by Deft,
Att: 5 C - Pltf's Dispute Email,
Att: 6 D - Credit Report Tradeline
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/16 8:34 AM
Judge Robert J. Colville added. (jd)
Related: [-]