California Southern District Court
Judge:Janis L Sammartino
Referred: Lupe Rodriguez, Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00861
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331ss Fed. Question: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 19, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of the State of California County o, ECU003473
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Intervenor Defendant
Rob Bonta
Represented By
Sharon L. O'Grady
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District
Represented By
Wendy Ortega
Feldesman Leifer LLP
contact info
Kathryn Doi
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info
Kathryn E. Doi
Feldesman Leifer LLP
contact info
Respondent
David Salgado
Represented By
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Respondent
Enola Berker
Represented By
Yulian Kolarov
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Ochoa
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Sanchez
Best Best & Krieger LLP
contact info
Justin M. Martin
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Respondent
Robert Amparano
Represented By
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Respondent
Katherine Burnworth
Represented By
Yulian Kolarov
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Ochoa
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Sanchez
Best Best & Krieger LLP
contact info
Justin M. Martin
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Respondent
Does 1 to 50
Respondent
Jesus E. Escobar
Represented By
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Respondent
James Garcia
Represented By
Yulian Kolarov
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Ochoa
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Sanchez
Best Best & Krieger LLP
contact info
Justin M. Martin
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Respondent
Laura Goodsell
Represented By
Yulian Kolarov
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Ochoa
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Sanchez
Best Best & Krieger LLP
contact info
Justin M. Martin
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Respondent
Rodolfo Valdez
Represented By
Yulian Kolarov
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Ochoa
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Sanchez
Best Best & Krieger LLP
contact info
Justin M. Martin
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Respondent
Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission
Represented By
Sarah Elizabeth Pfeffer
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley, PC
contact info
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Steven M. Walker
Walker & Driskill
contact info
Respondent
Arturo Proctor
Represented By
Yulian Kolarov
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Ochoa
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Sanchez
Best Best & Krieger LLP
contact info
Justin M. Martin
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Respondent
John Hawk
Represented By
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Respondent
Maria Nava-Froelich
Represented By
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Respondent
Javier Moreno
Represented By
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Respondent
Donald W. Medart Jr.
Represented By
Yulian Kolarov
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Ochoa
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Sanchez
Best Best & Krieger LLP
contact info
Justin M. Martin
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info
Respondent
Jose Landeros
Represented By
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Respondent
Michael W. Kelley
Represented By
Holly O. Whatley
Colantuono, Highsmith & Whatley
contact info
Respondent
Imperial Valley Healthcare District
Represented By
Yulian Kolarov
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Ochoa
Procopio
contact info
Adriana R. Sanchez
Best Best & Krieger LLP
contact info
Justin M. Martin
Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 19 2024
al County; and 4)Ordering Further Briefing on Petitioner's Request for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/24.(aas) (Certified copy sent to Imperial County State Court).ORDER: 1)Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Dimiss (24, 25, 26); 2)Vacating Hearing on Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Denying the Same as Moot (28); 3)Remanding Action to California Superior Court, Imperi
GPO Apr 11 2025
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Petitioner's Request for Attorneys' Fees re 41 Supplemental Document. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/11/25.(aas)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
44 44 14 pgs order Order Fri 04/11 10:12 AM
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Petitioner's Request for Attorneys' Fees re41 Supplemental Document. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/11/25.(aas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
43 43 misc Declaration Thu 12/26 12:12 PM
DECLARATION re40 Supplemental Document by Plaintiff Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District.(Doi, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to KED Supp. Declaration
Friday, October 04, 2024
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/04 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez (Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
41 41 misc Supplemental Document Fri 09/06 3:36 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez Response to Petitioner's Statement of Attorneys' Fees and Costs .(Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Adriana Ochoa ISO of Response to Petitioner's Statement of Attorneys Fees and Costs,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Ochoa Declaration ISO Response to Statement of Atty Fees and Costs
Friday, August 30, 2024
40 40 misc Supplemental Document Fri 08/30 1:22 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District .(Doi, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of KED ISO Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs
Monday, August 19, 2024
39 39 25 pgs order Order Remanding Case Mon 08/19 2:51 PM
ORDER: 1)Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Dimiss (24 ,25 ,26 ); 2)Vacating Hearing on Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Denying the Same as Moot (28 ); 3)Remanding Action to California Superior Court, Imperial County; and 4)Ordering Further Briefing on Petitioner's Request for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/24.(aas) (Certified copy sent to Imperial County State Court)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/02 11:45 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District.(Doi, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice Supplemental RJN ISO Reply ISO Motion for a Preliminary Injunction
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
37 37 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 07/31 2:49 PM
ORDER Vacating Hearings on Motions to Dismiss (24 ,25 ,26 ) and Taking Matters Under Submission. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/31/24.(aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/26 4:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez.(Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition to Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - R
35 35 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/26 4:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert Amparano, Jesus E. Escobar, John Hawk, Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission, Michael W. Kelley, Jose Landeros, Javier Moreno, Maria Nava-Froelich, David Salgado. (Whatley, Holly)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/26 11:41 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rob Bonta. (O'Grady, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/19 4:30 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert Amparano, Jesus E. Escobar, John Hawk, Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission, Michael W. Kelley, Jose Landeros, Javier Moreno, Maria Nava-Froelich, David Salgado. (Whatley, Holly)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply - Other Fri 07/19 4:18 PM
REPLY - Other re25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Standing filed by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez.(Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Adriana R. Ochoa,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 May 3-14 Email Exchange About Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 May 14 Email Exchange Pioneers
31 31 respm Reply - Other Fri 07/19 12:14 PM
REPLY - Other re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim By Intervener Rob Bonta, In His Official Capacity as California Attorney General [Reply In Further Support of Motion By Intervener California Attorney General Rob Bonta to Dismiss Complaint] filed by Rob Bonta. (O'Grady, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order Setting Briefing Schedule Mon 07/15 12:24 PM
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Responses due by 7/26/2024, Replies due by 8/2/2024. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/15/24.(aas)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/12 12:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim By Intervener Rob Bonta, In His Official Capacity as California Attorney General ,26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Standing filed by Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District.(Doi, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-S to RJN ISO Opposition
Thursday, July 11, 2024
28 28 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 07/11 2:44 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District.(Doi, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibits A-W to the RJN,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibits X-NN to the RJN
Thursday, June 27, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order Setting Briefing Schedule Thu 06/27 10:18 AM
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule On Motions To Dismiss (ECF Nos.24 ,25 ,26 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/27/2024.(ddf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 06/26 5:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robert Amparano, Jesus E. Escobar, John Hawk, Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission, Michael W. Kelley, Jose Landeros, Javier Moreno, Maria Nava-Froelich, David Salgado.(Whatley, Holly)Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party Robert Amparano(pty:res), Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party Jesus E. Escobar(pty:res), Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party John Hawk(pty:res), Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission(pty:res), Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party Michael W. Kelley(pty:res), Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party Jose Landeros(pty:res), Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party Javier Moreno(pty:res), Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party Maria Nava-Froelich(pty:res), Attorney Holly O. Whatley added to party David Salgado(pty:res)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
25 25 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 06/26 4:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Standing by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez.(Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Assembly Committee Min,
Att: 3 Exhibit Assembly Appropriations,
Att: 4 Exhibit Assembly Floor Analysis Third Reading,
Att: 5 Exhibit Senate Governance and Finance Committee Meeting,
Att: 6 Exhibit Senate Appropriations,
Att: 7 Exhibit Senate Appropriations,
Att: 8 Exhibit Senate Floor Analyses Third Reading,
Att: 9 Exhibit Senate Floor Analyses Third Reading,
Att: 10 Exhibit Assembly Floor Analysis,
Att: 11 Exhibit DHLP-Loan-Award Press Release,
Att: 12 Exhibit IVHD Special Meeting Minutes,
Att: 13 Exhibit Special Meeting Minutes,
Att: 14 Exhibit Regular Meeting Minutes
24 24 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 06/26 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim By Intervener Rob Bonta, In His Official Capacity as California Attorney General by Rob Bonta.(O'Grady, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice
Thursday, June 13, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon L. O'Grady on behalf of Rob Bonta (O'Grady, Sharon)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/13 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Intervention by Rob Bonta, in His Official Capacity as California Attorney General by Rob Bonta re21 Order (O'Grady, Sharon)Attorney Sharon L. O'Grady added to party Rob Bonta(pty:intvd)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Order Mon 06/10 2:53 PM
ORDER Certifying Petitioner's Constitutional Challenge20 Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1 and Procedure 28 U.S.C. § 2403. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/10/24.(aas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/06 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE OF STATE STATUTE by Pioneers Memorial Healthcare District (Doi, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/04 11:23 AM
ORDER on Joint Motions (14 ,17 ) to Extend Deadline to Respond to Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/4/24. (aas)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
18 18 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 06/03 4:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24CV0861-JLS-LR.(no document attached) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Thu 05/30 4:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extend Deadline to Respond to Amended Petition by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez. (Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/30 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance /Association of Counsel for Imperial County LAFCO and Individual Imperial County LAFCO Commissioners by Sarah Elizabeth Pfeffer on behalf of Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission (Pfeffer, Sarah)Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Pfeffer added to party Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission(pty:res) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/28 11:24 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Petition by Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission.(Walker, Steven)Attorney Steven M. Walker added to party Imperial Local Agency Formation Commission(pty:res)(jpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Supplement
Friday, May 24, 2024
15 15 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 05/28 11:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John A. Houston is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24cv00861 BEN-LR.(no document attached) (bdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/22 4:45 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint re10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to amended petition Responses due by 6/12/2024. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/22/2024. (bdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
12 12 order Order of Judge Transfer Wed 05/22 3:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge William Q. Hayes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24CV861-JAH-LR.(no document attached) (alns) (jmo)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate of Service Tue 05/21 5:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez (Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/21 5:32 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to amended petition by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez. (Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Certificate of Service Tue 05/21 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez (Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/21 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Removal (Amended) by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez(Ochoa, Adriana)Attorney Adriana R. Ochoa added to party Enola Berker(pty:res), Attorney Adriana R. Ochoa added to party Katherine Burnworth(pty:res), Attorney Adriana R. Ochoa added to party James Garcia(pty:res), Attorney Adriana R. Ochoa added to party Laura Goodsell(pty:res), Attorney Adriana R. Ochoa added to party Imperial Valley Healthcare District(pty:res), Attorney Adriana R. Ochoa added to party Donald W. Medart Jr.(pty:res), Attorney Adriana R. Ochoa added to party Arturo Proctor(pty:res), Attorney Adriana R. Ochoa added to party Rodolfo Valdez(pty:res)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition for Writ of Mandate,
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate,
Att: 3 Exhibit State Action Docket,
Att: 4 Exhibit FILED Notice of Removal (State)
7 7 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 05/21 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. is no longer assigned. The new case number is 24CV861-JAH-LR.(no document attached) (alns)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
6 6 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 05/20 1:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24-cv-00861-WQH-LR.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (rxc)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 05/20 1:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24-cv-00861-WQH-BLM.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (rxc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/20 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Adriana R. Ochoa (Ochoa, Adriana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
3 3 service Certificate of Service Thu 05/16 11:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez (Ochoa, Adriana) (exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
2 2 service Certificate of Service Wed 05/15 5:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Enola Berker, Katherine Burnworth, James Garcia, Laura Goodsell, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr., Arturo Proctor, Rodolfo Valdez re Notice of Removal (Martin, Justin) (exs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/15 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18851631.), filed by Rodolfo Valdez, James Garcia, Katherine Burnworth, Laura Goodsell, Enola Berker, Imperial Valley Healthcare District, Donald W. Medart Jr.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-861-W-BLM. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Exhibit A - Petition for Writ of Mandate Court Docket,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - State Court Docket,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - State Court Notice