California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:24-cv-04068
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 12:27 AM PST
Defendant
George Gomez Quintero
Defendant
Scott A. Graeff
Represented By
Kelly Marie Morrison
Jenner And Block LLP
contact info
Defendant
Luna Innovations Incorporated
Represented By
Heather Marie Speers
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eugene J. Nestro
Plaintiff
Lee Michael Thompson
Represented By
Lucas E Gilmore
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Reed R Kathrein
Hagen Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 07/19 3:49 PM
ORDER GRANTING Motion to Consolidate the Related Action, Appoint George Lang as Lead Plaintiff, and Approve his Selection of Lead Counsel 9, 13, 14, 17 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall that (1) Pursuant to FRCP 41, the Motions to Consolidate are GRANTED, and Karzoun v. Luna Innovations Incorporated, et al. No. 2:24-cv-02630-CBM-KS, and Thompson v. Luna Innovations Incorporated, e al., No. 2:24-cv-04068-CBM-KS, are hereby consolidated for all purposes. These actions shall be referred to herein as the "Consolidated Action." (2) Every pleading in this Consolidated Action shall bear the following caption: Master File No. 2:24-cv-02630-CBM-KS CLASS ACTION. In re LUNA INNOVATIONS INCORPORATED SECURITIES LITIGATION. This Document Relates To: ALL ACTIONS. (See document for further details). Movants Nicolas Ray, Luis Hernandez, and Zachari Pirbudagov's motions for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of counsel (Dkt. Nos. 13, 14, 17) are DENIED. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
20 20 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 06/26 9:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SET RESPONSE DEADLINE FOR CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT19 by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The deadline to respond to the Thompson Complaint will be vacated, and Defendants are not required to respond to either the Thompson Complaint or the Karzoun Complaint. Within 14 days of the Courts appointment of a lead plaintiff, counsel for the lead plaintiff and counsel for Defendants shall confer and propose to the Court a schedule for the filing of a consolidated amended complaint and for Defendants' responses to that complaint. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS). (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
19 19 stip Vacate Wed 06/19 10:30 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Vacate deadline to respond to complaint and set schedule for filing consolidated complaint and response thereto filed by Defendant Luna Innovations Incorporated.(Speers, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 06/19 10:10 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelly Marie Morrison counsel for Defendant Scott A. Graeff. Adding Kelly M. Morrison as counsel of record for Defendant Scott Graeff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Scott Graeff. (Attorney Kelly Marie Morrison added to party Scott A. Graeff(pty:dft))(Morrison, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 06/18 5:59 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Heather Marie Speers counsel for Defendant Luna Innovations Incorporated. Adding Heather M. Speers as counsel of record for Luna Innovations Incorporated for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Luna Innovations Incorporated. (Attorney Heather Marie Speers added to party Luna Innovations Incorporated(pty:dft))(Speers, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 06/13 11:20 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson, upon Defendant George Gomez Quintero served on 6/6/2024, answer due 6/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vanessa Gomez, Daughter in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 06/13 11:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson, upon Defendant Eugene J. Nestro served on 6/7/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eugene Nestro, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 06/13 11:14 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson, upon Defendant Scott A. Graeff served on 6/6/2024, answer due 6/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eva Guzman, Live in House Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 06/03 3:06 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson, upon Defendant Luna Innovations Incorporated served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nadia Bellamy, Service of Process Intake, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/23 9:21 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. See order for details. (ys)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Fri 05/17 3:15 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:24-cv-02630 CBM(KSx). Case transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-04068 CBM(KSx). Signed by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/16 6:02 PM
Civil standing order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/16 1:22 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants George Gomez Quintero, Scott A. Graeff, Luna Innovations Incorporated, Eugene J. Nestro. (sh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 05/16 1:13 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 05/16 1:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 05/16 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Wed 05/15 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson. Related Case(s): 2:24-cv-02630 (Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/15 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson, (Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 05/15 5:41 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson. (Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 05/15 5:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson. (Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/15 5:13 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37478129 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Lee Michael Thompson. (Attorney Lucas E Gilmore added to party Lee Michael Thompson(pty:pla))(Gilmore, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PSLRA Certification