Texas Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00089
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Javier Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-Waco
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Ashley Ali Askari
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Siddharth Dadhich
Assistant United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2024 3:29 AM CDT
Friday, January 19, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske as to Javier Gonzalez (1). (cav) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske as to Javier Gonzalez. (cav) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
Arrest of Javier Gonzalez (1). (zv) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Javier Gonzalez (1). (zv) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland:Initial Appearance as to Javier Gonzalez (1) held on 4/19/2024. Defendant HAS NOT completed the CJA23 financial affidavit. Court will appoint counsel in the interest of justice but will require an affidavit to be completed by the next hearing. Duty Pub. Defender-Waco is temporarily appointed. Attorney Duty Pub. Defender-Waco for Javier Gonzalez added. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Government orally moves for detention. Temporary Detention is ordered until Detention Hearing. Detention Hearing is set for for 4/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Court Advises defendant of right to notify consulate. OTHER PROCEEDINGS: ACTIVE IMMIGRATION DETAINER. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.) (zv) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Javier Gonzalez (1). Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed temporarily to represent the Defendant. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Javier Gonzalez (1). Detention Hearing set for 4/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Javier Gonzalez (1). PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING set for 4/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 04/17/2024 as to Javier Gonzalez. (zv) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
Attorney Duty Pub. Defender-Waco terminated as to Javier Gonzalez. (lad) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ashley Ali Askari appearing for Javier Gonzalez . Attorney Ashley Ali Askari added to party Javier Gonzalez(pty:dft) (Askari, Ashley) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
9 9 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearings by Javier Gonzalez. (Askari, Ashley) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Continue as to Javier Gonzalez (1). Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 5/7/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER CANCELLING DETENTION HEARING as to Javier Gonzalez. DETENTION HEARING on 05/07/2024 at 09:00 AM is hereby CANCELLED Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cav) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to NO BOND as to Javier Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cav) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
13 13 ORDER RESETTING PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Javier Gonzalez (1). Preliminary Hearing set for 5/10/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (zv) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske:Preliminary Hearing as to Javier Gonzalez held on 5/10/2024. Witnesses sworn. Testimony heard. Order finding of probable cause as to Defendant. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.) (cav) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
15 15 WITNESS LIST by USA as to Javier Gonzalez. (cav) [6:24-mj-00009-JCM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
16 16 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Javier Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
18 18 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Javier Gonzalez (bot1)
Related: [-]