Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-08303
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO (1)
Represented By
Daniel N. Marx
Fick & Marx LLP
contact info
William W. Fick
Fick & Marx LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
J. Mackenzie Duane
United States Attorney'S Office Ma
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2024 4:15 AM EDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5) of ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO (Montes, Mariliz)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO (Montes, Mariliz) (Montes, Mariliz).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/15/2024) sealed indictment
2 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO. Initial Appearance set for 5/15/2024 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 25 (In person only) before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William W. Fick appearing for ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Fick, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel N. Marx appearing for ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Marx, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO; Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
Related: [-]
6 6 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson: Initial Appearance as to ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO held on 5/15/2024.The Court advised the defendant of his rights and the charges against him. The Court advises the defendant of his rights to counsel. The Court notes defendant retained William W. Fick and Daniel N. Marx as counsel. The government did not seek detention but rather moved for release on conditions. The parties agreed to the proposed conditions from probation. The Court informed the defendant of his conditions of release. The Court reminded the government of its obligations under Rule 5 (f). The Court released the defendant on conditions and a secured bond of $250,000 to be pain in full and signed by two cosigners (cash or property) no later than May 29, 2024. Defendant to appear in the United State District Court of of New York on May 23, 2024 at 11:00am. (Attorneys present: Atty Fick, Atty Marx and AUSA Duane. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please email the Court at[LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact the Court by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov. (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ANTON PERAIRE-BUENO. (Dumoulin, Rose)
Related: [-]