Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00144
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 2:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Andrew Carl Nichols (1)
Represented By
Maria Esther Torres Chin-FPD
Assistant Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Marissa Aulbaugh-DOJ
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2024 3:09 AM CST
Monday, March 18, 2024
3 3 MOTION for Detention and MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing filed by USA as to Andrew Carl Nichols. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
Arrest of Andrew Carl Nichols. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Andrew Carl Nichols. Federal Public Defender for Andrew Carl Nichols appointed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/20/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Motion to Continue as to Andrew Carl Nichols (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/20/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Andrew Carl Nichols. Detention/PC Hearing set for 3/27/2024 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1620, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/20/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Initial Appearance as to Andrew Carl Nichols held on 3/20/2024. Date of Arrest: 3/19/2024. The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Marissa Albaugh; Defense - Natalie Ebolum. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (Court Reporter: Debbie Kriegshauser) (Interpreter NA.) (USPO Chavez.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Andrew Carl Nichols: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/20/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
9 9 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Andrew Carl Nichols. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
11 11 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Detention/Preliminary Hearing not held on 3/27/2024 as to Andrew Carl Nichols. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Marissa Albaugh; Defense - Natalie Ebolum. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (Court Reporter: Debbie Kriegshauser) (USPO Acosta.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER granting3 Motion for Detention as to Andrew Carl Nichols (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/27/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Andrew Carl Nichols. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Andrew Carl Nichols. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
15 15 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Andrew Carl Nichols. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Maria Esther Torres Chin-FPD (Clerk to Set Designation as: Federal Public Defender Appointment) appearing for Andrew Carl Nichols (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Torres Chin-FPD, Maria) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/19/2024 as to Andrew Carl Nichols. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00261-BK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
18 18 8 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Andrew Carl Nichols (1) count(s) 1-4. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (ykp)
Related: [-]