California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 4:24-cv-02904
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 1:20 AM PST
Defendant
Mark Bachofer
Defendant
Tiffany Uhri Chu
Defendant
Kerry Kip
Defendant
Alison Peterson
Plaintiff
Elijah Dominguez
PFN UMF 240 Santa Rita Jail 5325 Broder Blvd.
Dublin, CA 94568


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/02 12:52 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case.Signed by THE CLERK on 07/02/2024. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 07/01 11:58 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL, Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/1/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 06/14 8:37 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/30 9:28 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended IFP Application or Payment of Filing Fee due by 7/5/2024.(wft, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 05/29 8:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 10:14 AM
NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/14/2024. (dhm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 05/15 10:09 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/15 10:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elijah Dominguez. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/15 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Mark Bachofer, Tiffany Uhri Chu, Kerry Kip, Alison Peterson. (No process, IFP pending) Filed by Elijah Dominguez. Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2024.(dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope