California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:24-cv-02959
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Nov 11, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Shelby Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff
Johanson Transportation Service
Represented By
Najwa F. Alsheikh
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Lauryn Taylor Robinson
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2024
ORDER re Service of Process. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/2024. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2024)
GPO Jan 27 2025
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2025)

Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
33 33 order Judgment Thu 04/03 9:48 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/2025. (vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
32 32 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 9:39 AM
ORDER GRANTING 27 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/2025. (vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
31 31 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Mon 03/31 12:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2025 re 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion re 27 Motion for Attorney Fees is Granted. Total Time in Court: 4 Minutes. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2025)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
30 30 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/27 8:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing as to 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees reset from 3/13/2025 to 3/17/2025, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
29 29 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 02/20 5:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johanson Transportation Service re27 MOTION for Attorney Fees ,28 Bill of Costs (Lipson, Carlo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
28 28 misc Bill of Costs Thu 02/06 6:38 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Johanson Transportation Service. Objections due by 2/20/2025. (Robinson, Lauryn)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Attorney Fees Thu 02/06 6:34 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Johanson Transportation Service. Motion for Attorney Fees Hearing set for 3/13/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 2/20/2025. Replies due by 2/27/2025.(Robinson, Lauryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lauryn T. Robinson,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, January 27, 2025
26 26 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 01/27 9:58 AM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (emclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
25 25 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Motion Hearing Fri 01/24 3:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2025 re 18 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Shelby Transportation, Inc. Total Time in Court: 2 Minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/24/2025)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 01/17 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel: Attorney Carlo Jack Lipson substituted for Najwa Alsheikh on behalf of Johanson Transportation Service (Lipson, Carlo)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 12/27 10:55 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:23 Certificate of Service filed by Johanson Transportation Service (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
23 23 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 12/19 5:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johanson Transportation Service (Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
22 22 oth_sup Supplemental Brief Fri 12/13 5:31 PM
Supplemental Brief re20 Order filed byJohanson Transportation Service. Related [+] (Robinson, Lauryn)
Related: [-] 20
Att: 1 Declaration of Lauryn T. Robinson,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J
Friday, December 06, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/06 9:41 AM
ORDER re Service of Process. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/2024. (emclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/13 8:54 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing as to 18 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Shelby Transportation, Inc. reset from 12/5/2024 to 1/23/2025, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO ARRIVE IN COURTROOM 5, 17TH FLOOR AT 1:10 PM TO CHECK-IN WITH THE COURTROOM DEPUTY. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
21 21 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Case Management Conference - Initial Wed 12/11 8:09 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/5/2024. Total Time in Court: 7 Minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2024)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
18 18 motion Default Judgment - by the Court Mon 11/04 7:01 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Shelby Transportation, Inc. filed by Johanson Transportation Service. Motion for Default Judgment Hearing set for 12/5/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 11/18/2024. Replies due by 11/25/2024.(Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brett Caeton,
Att: 3 Declaration Najwa Alsheikh,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Monday, September 30, 2024
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 09/30 2:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING TIME OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 11/5/2024, at 1:30 PM to 11/5/2024, at 3:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Wed 09/18 12:09 PM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Shelby Transportation, Inc.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+](mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)15
Friday, September 13, 2024
15 15 motion Default Judgment - by the Clerk Fri 09/13 12:35 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by the Clerk as to Defendant Shelby Transportation, Inc. filed by Johanson Transportation Service. (Alsheikh, Najwa) Modified on 9/13/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 09/13 1:17 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. The correct event is 'MOTION for Entry of Default'. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:15 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Defendant Shelby Transportation, Inc. filed by Johanson Transportation Service. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 08/16 6:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 8/20/2024 to 11/5/2024, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 1:20 PM. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
13 13 misc Case Management Statement Tue 08/13 8:09 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Johanson Transportation Service. (Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/16 3:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johanson Transportation Service. Shelby Transportation, Inc. served on 6/28/2024, answer due 7/19/2024. (Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 06/21 9:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Shelby Transportation, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
10 10 misc Proposed Summons Thu 06/20 2:40 PM
Proposed Summons. (Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Thu 06/20 2:05 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Johanson Transportation Service as to Shelby Transportation, Inc..(Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Non Service Report
Thursday, May 23, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/23 9:10 AM
Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauryn Robinson.(vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/20 2:29 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19432316.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/20/2024 filed by Johanson Transportation Service.(Robinson, Lauryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, May 16, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 05/16 12:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Shelby Transportation, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 05/16 12:15 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/16 11:29 AM
Case assigned to Judge Edward M Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/16 9:55 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johanson Transportation Service (Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 05/16 9:52 AM
Proposed Summons. (Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 9:50 AM
COMPLAINT For: (1) Breach of Contract; and (2) Liability Under the Carmack Amendment (49 U.S.C. § 14706) against Shelby Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19421130.). Filed by Johanson Transportation Service.(Alsheikh, Najwa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet