Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:24-bk-41694
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Dec 19, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Grand Fusion Housewares, LLC
1215 W Crosby Rd Ste 100
Carrollton, TX 75006-6951
Represented By
Bryan C. Assink
Bonds Ellis Eppich Schafer Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
141 141 order Discharging subchapter V trustee Thu 05/15 12:35 PM
Order discharging subchapter V trustee in a chapter 11 case. Entered on 5/15/2025 (Speer, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
140 140 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution F-non-consensual plan consummated, fees awarded Thu 05/08 1:12 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 12 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $413932.12, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $3148723.83, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $3148723.83. (Vida -SBRA V, Behrooz)
Related: [-]