Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:24-cv-00921
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024
Case in other court:Ninth Judicial Circuit Osceola County, FL, 2024-CA-000987 CI
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 3:24 AM EST
Defendant
National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By
Shannon Fernandez
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Shannon M Fernandez
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
David Joshua Maldoff
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
William Roderick Lewis
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vergison International Investments, Inc.
Represented By
Guillermo Lopez Segarra
Cohen Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
22 22 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 10/23 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/23 8:31 AM
ORDER re 20 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/23/2024. (ND)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/22 11:35 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary by Vergison International Investments, Inc.. (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 07/15 3:41 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 15, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. EST before Pamela Perry. (Fernandez, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/12 1:29 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Vergison International Investments, Inc.. (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/01 11:11 AM
ORDER. This cause is before the Court on the Case Management Report filed by the parties (Doc. 15 ). The report indicates that the parties have not yet agreed on a mediator. Therefore, the parties are directed to confer and advise the Court on the selection of a mediator and the mediation date within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/1/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 07/01 11:10 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 8/12/2024. Discovery due by 5/5/2025. Dispositive motions due by 6/2/2025. Pretrial statement due by 9/16/2025. All other motions due by 9/23/2025. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 3/3/2025. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 4/1/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2025 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing on 11/3/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/12/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/1/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
15 15 misc Case Management Report Tue 06/25 2:05 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Fernandez, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/04 11:20 AM
Amended CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Vergison International Investments, Inc. (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo) Modified to edit docket text on 6/4/2024 (EVK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 05/23 10:21 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Vergison International Investments, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/22 3:39 PM
NOTICE by Vergison International Investments, Inc. Notice of Pendency (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 3:35 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Vergison International Investments, Inc.. (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 05/21 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Guillermo Lopez Segarra on behalf of Vergison International Investments, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Guillermo J. Lopez, Esq.. (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/17 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Guillermo Lopez Segarra of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/17 12:43 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for National Fire & Marine Insurance Company.. (Maldoff, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of appearance Fri 05/17 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Guillermo Lopez Segarra on behalf of Vergison International Investments, Inc. (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Interested Persons Order Fri 05/17 10:18 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/17/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/17 8:04 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/17/2024. (JOR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 05/16 4:18 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Shannon M. Fernandez of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RLK)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/16 4:17 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-921-PGB-EJK. (RLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 05/16 3:12 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Maldoff, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/16 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Osceola County, case number 2024-CA-000967 CI filed in State Court on 4.8.2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22100914 filed by All Defendants.(Maldoff, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court ANSWER,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 5