Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:24-cv-00920
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 12:40 AM PST
Defendant
Premium Waters, Inc.
Represented By
Richard T Creer
Kamer Zucker Abbott
contact info
Dare Heisterman
Kamer Zucker Abbott
contact info
Plaintiff
David Vanderkipp
Represented By
Trevor J. Hatfield
Hatfield & Associates, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 05/06 2:27 PM
ORDER Granting24 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. Based on the parties' stipulation [ECF No.24 ] and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the deadline to respond to the motion for summary judgment [ECF No.18 ] is EXTENDED to May 5, 2025, making the response filed at ECF No.25 timely. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to file a reply to that opposition [ECF No.25 ] is extended to June 2, 2025. Responses due by 5/5/2025. Replies due by 6/2/2025. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/6/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 respm Response Mon 05/05 5:44 PM
RESPONSE to24 Stipulation,18 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff David Vanderkipp. Replies due by 5/19/2025.(Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit One,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit Two,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit Three,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit Four,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit Five,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit Six,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit Seven,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit Eight
Friday, May 02, 2025
24 24 motion Stipulation Fri 05/02 3:22 PM
Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to Respond to re18 Motion for Summary Judgment,23 Order on Stipulation,,, by Plaintiff David Vanderkipp. (Hatfield, Trevor) (extend) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 04/25 2:41 PM
ORDER Granting22 Stipulation to Extend to Respond to18 Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/30/2025. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/25/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
22 22 motion Stipulation Thu 04/24 4:31 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff David Vanderkipp. (Hatfield, Trevor) (extend) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/15 11:12 AM
ORDER granting19 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT PREMIUM WATERS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ECF #18 (First Request). Plaintiff shall have up to and including April 25, 2025, to respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall have up to and including May 23, 2025, to reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/14/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
20 20 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Fri 04/11 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re19 Stipulation by Plaintiff David Vanderkipp. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
19 19 motion Stipulation Thu 04/10 2:53 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff David Vanderkipp. (Hatfield, Trevor) (extend) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 motion Motion Summary Judgment Thu 03/20 10:04 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.. Responses due by 4/10/2025.(Heisterman, Dare)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Premium Waters, Inc.'s Index of Exhibits Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment
Monday, January 13, 2025
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/13 3:28 PM
ORDER granting16 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. Motions due by 3/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/13/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
16 16 motion Stipulation Fri 01/10 5:43 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO EXTEND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.. (Heisterman, Dare) (extend) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 09/24 2:41 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 9/24/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Pla Counsel: Trevor Hatfield and Plaintiff David Vanderklipp ; Def Counsel: R. Todd Creer, Dare E. Heisterman, and Defendant Representative Betsy Copiskey An early neutral evaluation session was conducted before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah commencing at 9:00 a.m. on September 24, 2024, which concluded at approximately 2:00 p.m. No settlement was reached. Thus, this matter will continue on the litigation track. IT IS SO ORDERED this 24th day of September, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
14 14 misc Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ Thu 08/29 4:19 PM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court regarding assignment of case to Magistrate Judge. (The attached document is restricted to the Office of the Clerk and is not viewable. The filer of this document is also restricted. See General Orders 2023-11 and 2023-12.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Fri 08/16 11:38 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
12 12 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 08/16 11:35 AM
ORDER granting11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/2/2025. Motions due by 2/3/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/5/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 08/14 8:23 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Premium Waters, Inc.. (Heisterman, Dare)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order Mon 07/08 1:58 PM
ORDER. An in-person Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) is set for Tuesday, September 24, 2024. Plaintiff must report to the chambers of the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge, Room 3005, Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Las Vegas, Nevada at 9:00 a.m. Defendant must report to the chambers of the undersigned at 9:30 a.m. The confidential evaluation statement, with exhibits should not, generally, exceed 50 pages and must be delivered electronically to Emily_Santiago@nvd.uscourts.gov by 3:00 p.m. on September 17, 2024. Do not serve a copy of your confidential evaluation statement on opposing counsel. Do not deliver or mail a copy to the clerks office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 07/05 8:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Premium Waters, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Heisterman, Dare)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/05 8:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Premium Waters, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/15/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/19/2024.(Heisterman, Dare)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/28 5:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Vanderkipp re1 Complaint,,. Premium Waters, Inc. served on 6/14/2024. (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 06/03 7:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David Vanderkipp. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 05/28 5:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David Vanderkipp. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
misc QC Notice Tue 05/28 6:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by David Vanderkipp. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/4/2024. (no image attached) (KMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 05/16 3:56 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Premium Waters, Inc. re1 Complaint. (CAH)
Related: [-]
2 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Premium Waters, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7688877) by David VanderKlipp. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/26/2024. Proof of service due by 8/14/2024. (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 05/16 3:50 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CAH)
Related: [-]
notice ENE Notice Thu 05/16 3:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]