Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:24-cv-01822
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 2:27 AM CST
Defendant
Air Liquide Electronics U.S., LP
Represented By
Jeffrey E Dilger
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Grant Daniel Goerke
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Guidant Global, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey E Dilger
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Grant Daniel Goerke
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Icon Consultants, LP
Represented By
Debra L Weiss
Meagher & Geer, Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Williams
Represented By
Ross D Stadheim
Msb Employment Justice LLP
contact info
Colin John Pasterski
Mjsb Employment Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
32 32 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Tue 12/03 3:25 PM
JUDGMENT(CLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/03 10:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 12/3/2024. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
30 30 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Mon 12/02 11:32 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re29 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Weiss, Debra)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/02 11:30 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Icon Consultants, LP. Jointly Signed by Anthony Williams, Air Liquide Electronics U.S. LP, and Guidant Global, Inc.. (Weiss, Debra)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
28 28 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 10/15 1:37 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/11/2024: Settlement Conference - Binding Settlement Reached. Digital Recording Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom Video Conference Time: 10:30a / 11a Total Time: 30 min SEALED Time: 10:51a / 11a Total SEALED Time: 8.5 min APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): rpss Stadheim For Defendant(s): Grant Goerke for Air Liquide Electronics and Guidant Global; Debra Weiss for Icon Consultants PROCEEDINGS: Sealed terms stated on the record. Any transcript or copy of the audio file of the terms of settlement is CONFIDENTIAL and shall be SEALED. Access restricted to the parties and their counsel. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
27 27 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 10/09 3:31 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/9/2024: Settlement Conference - Settlement Not Reached. No Digital Recording Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom 9E Time: 9:30a / 2:30p Total Time: 5 hr 30 min APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Ross Stadheim For Defendant(s): Grant Goerke for Air Liquide Electronics and Guidant Global; Debra Weiss, Tony Joyce for Icon Consultants PROCEEDINGS: (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
26 26 order Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail Tue 09/24 4:40 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting the parties' joint request to extend the deadline to submit settlement conference statements. Parties shall submit their statements by 10/01/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/24/2024.(KRF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
25 25 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 08/14 2:55 PM
ORDER/NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 9/25/2024. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 9/25/2024. Settlement Conference set for 10/9/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/14/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
24 24 misc Declaration Wed 07/24 8:18 AM
Second DECLARATION of Brandon Caire by Air Liquide Electronics U.S., LP . (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
23 23 misc Declaration Mon 07/22 12:14 PM
Supplemental DECLARATION of Amber Buckheister by Icon Consultants, LP . (Weiss, Debra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
22 22 order Order/Notice to Attorney Thu 07/18 9:57 AM
ORDER REGARDING LR 5.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/18/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ex 1,
Att: 2 ex 2
21 21 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/18 9:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2024. Fact Discovery due by 3/7/2025. Motions (non-disp) due 4/4/2025. Motions (disp) due by 6/6/2025. Ready for trial due by 9/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/18/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
20 20 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 07/17 12:28 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/16/2024: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. No Digital Recording Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom 9E Time: 4p / 4:10p Total Time: 10 min APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Ross Stadheim For Defendant(s): Grant Goerke PROCEEDINGS: Discussion of Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Mon 06/24 4:51 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/24/2024.(MDC)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 06/24 3:21 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Icon Consultants, LP. Jointly Signed by Anthony Williams, Air Liquide Electronics U.S. LP, Guidant Global, Inc., and Icon Information Consultants, LP.(Weiss, Debra)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
17 17 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 06/14 4:59 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE RESETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/9/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/9/2024. Confidential letters due 7/9/24. Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2024 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/14/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
16 16 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Tue 06/04 10:17 AM
(Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Anthony W. Joyce as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
15 15 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 06/03 2:34 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Icon Consultants, LP. (Weiss, Debra)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/03 2:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Icon Consultants, LP. (Weiss, Debra)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 05/31 4:32 PM
ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 6/25/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/25/2024. Confidential letters due 6/25/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/31/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 05/31 4:20 PM
ORDER on10 Stipulation. Icon Consultants, LP answer due 6/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 5/31/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 05/31 9:40 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re10 Stipulation. (Weiss, Debra)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Fri 05/31 9:38 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer as to Defendant ICON Consultants, LP by Icon Consultants, LP. Jointly Signed by Anthony Williams. (Weiss, Debra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/23 2:17 PM
Defendant Guidant Global, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses filed by Guidant Global, Inc.. (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/23 2:15 PM
Defendant Air Liquide Electronics U.S. LP's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses filed by Air Liquide Electronics U.S., LP. (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Thu 05/16 2:39 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-1822 JWB/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Thu 05/16 2:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Air Liquide Electronics U.S., LP, Guidant Global, Inc. re3 Declaration,1 Notice of Removal,4 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,2 Declaration,5 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Thu 05/16 2:30 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Guidant Global, Inc.. (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Thu 05/16 2:28 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Air Liquide Electronics U.S., LP. (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Thu 05/16 2:24 PM
DECLARATION of Brandon Caire re1 Notice of Removal, by Air Liquide Electronics U.S., LP, Guidant Global, Inc. . (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Thu 05/16 2:19 PM
DECLARATION of Amber L. Buckheister re1 Notice of Removal, by Air Liquide Electronics U.S., LP, Guidant Global, Inc. . (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/16 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carver, case number N/A (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11056750) filed by Guidant Global, Inc., Air Liquide Electronics U.S., LP. No summons requested. (Goerke, Grant)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet