Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-00830
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
Capital Caring Hospice
Represented By
Dana Leinbach
Blankingship & Keith
contact info
Erica Jilek
Miller Johnson (mi-Na)
contact info
Laurie Lea Kirkland
Blankingship & Keith Pc (fairfax)
contact info
Matthew Martin O'Rourke
Miller Johnson (na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Stacy Nelson
Represented By
Alexander Castelli
Doumar Martin PLLC
contact info
Kellie Maxine Louise Budd
Doumar Martin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
28 28 order So Ordered Thu 02/20 12:08 PM
So Ordered in re27 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Stacy Nelson. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/20/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/20 11:15 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Stacy Nelson. (Castelli, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/18 11:02 AM
ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order the parties either FILE a stipulation of dismissal or SHOW CAUSE as to why this civil action should not be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/18/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/13 8:26 PM
ORDERED that this civil action be and is STAYED for thirty (30) days, by which time the parties must either file a stipulation of dismissal or notify the Court as to why no such stipulation has been filed. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/13/2025. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Mon 01/13 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Stacy Nelson (Budd, Kellie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 01/08 11:26 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Electronic Device Application Fri 01/03 9:01 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Electronic Device Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 1/2/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Electronic Device Application Fri 01/03 9:01 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Electronic Device Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 1/2/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Electronic Device Application Thu 01/02 11:29 AM
MOTION for Electronic Device Application For Settlement Conference by Stacy Nelson. (Budd, Kellie)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Electronic Device Application Thu 01/02 10:08 AM
MOTION for Electronic Device Application for Settlement Conference by Capital Caring Hospice. (Kirkland, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 minutes Pretrial Conference - Final ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/19 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema: Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/19/2024. Appearances of counsel. Counsel provides status update to the Court. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2025 (approx. 2 days) at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (Court Reporter S. Austin)(kgall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 12/12 6:47 PM
ORDER denying17 Joint MOTION to Continue Final Pretrial Conference; however, to minimize unnecessary expenses, it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for filing the parties' witness lists, exhibits, and stipulations be and is extended to January 13, 2025. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/12/2024. (jlan)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Continue Thu 12/12 3:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Final Pretrial Conference by Stacy Nelson.(Castelli, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 12/10 10:40 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 12:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
16 16 order Protective Order Fri 09/20 9:28 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: the handling and labeling of confidential information (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 9/19/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Waiver of Thu 09/19 11:46 AM
Waiver of re14 Consent MOTION for Protective Order Waiver of Hearing by Capital Caring Hospice (Kirkland, Laurie)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Protective Order Thu 09/19 11:46 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Capital Caring Hospice.(Kirkland, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kellie Maxine Louise Budd on behalf of Stacy Nelson (Budd, Kellie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
12 12 5 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Thu 08/15 1:04 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Proposed Joint Discovery Plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Joint Discovery Plan) (Dkt. No. 11) and at the initial pretrial conference held on August 14, 2024, and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Dkt. No. 7), the court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by December 13, 2024. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by August 28, 2024. 4. Expert disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be made in accordance with paragraph II.A of the Joint Discovery Plan. Specifically, Plaintiffs expert report(s) will be due by October 7, 2024, Defendants expert report(s) will be due by November 11, 2024, and any rebuttal report(s) will be due by November 25, 2024. To the extent the parties wish to modify expert deadlines, they must seek leave of court. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 8/14/24. (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 08/15 12:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/14/2024. Appearance of counsel. Joint Discovery Plan is adopted as amended. (per WEF chambers). (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
11 11 misc Discovery Plan Tue 08/06 3:38 PM
Proposed Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Capital Caring Hospice.(Leinbach, Dana)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leinbach on behalf of Capital Caring Hospice (Leinbach, Dana)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 20, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sat 07/20 7:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Mon 07/22 9:42 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Erica Jilek for Capital Caring Hospice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/19/2024. (nneb)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Mon 07/22 9:36 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Matthew Martin O'Rourke for Capital Caring Hospice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/19/2024. (nneb)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Scheduling Order Fri 07/19 12:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. Discovery due by 12/13/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/19/2024.(kgall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/19 10:54 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Erica L. Jilek and Certification of Local Counsel Laurie Lea Kirkland Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9641081. by Capital Caring Hospice. (Kirkland, Laurie)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/19 10:53 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Martin O'Rourke and Certification of Local Counsel Laurie Lea Kirkland Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9641071. by Capital Caring Hospice. (Kirkland, Laurie)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 07/19 10:49 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Capital Caring Hospice. (Kirkland, Laurie)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/19 10:48 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Capital Caring Hospice.(Kirkland, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/23 2:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stacy Nelson. All Defendants. (Castelli, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
utility Remark Fri 05/17 11:30 AM
No service issued at this time.(Cwel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 5:43 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9532123.), filed by Stacy Nelson.(Castelli, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/17 11:24 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Cwel)
Related: [-]