Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Case #: 1:24-cv-01381
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024
Case in other court:District Court Teller County, 2024cv030016
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 1:17 AM MST
Defendant
City of Woodland Park
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Teller County Short-Term Rental Alliance
Represented By
David William Illingworth, II
Illingworth Law LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kellie Case
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
City Council of Woodland Park
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Frank Connors
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Carrol Harvey
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Hilary LaBarre
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Catherine Nakai
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rusty Neal
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Aaron Vassalotti
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Robert Zuluaga
Terminated: 06/05/2024
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
31 31 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Wed 10/30 3:37 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to ECF29 on 30 October 2024. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/30 1:48 PM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT16 Motion to Dismiss in light of29 Notice of Dismissal. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/30/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Wed 10/30 1:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Teller County Short-Term Rental Alliance (Illingworth, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/16 4:44 PM
REPLY to Response to16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant City of Woodland Park.(Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/06 3:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The defendant may file a reply in support of16 Motion to Dismiss on or before 8/16/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/6/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/06 1:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant City of Woodland Park. (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
25 25 respm Response to Motion Thu 07/25 11:38 PM
RESPONSE to16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Teller County Short-Term Rental Alliance.(Illingworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ordinance 1431
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
24 24 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/23 11:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/3/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 7/23/2024. (evaug)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
23 23 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 3:20 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant City of Woodland Park. (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 07/15 1:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order. The deadline to file a proposed scheduling order is extended to July 22, 2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 7/15/2024. Text Only Entry(mdblc1)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Referring Motion Mon 07/15 12:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order filed by City of Woodland Park. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/15/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time Mon 07/15 12:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant City of Woodland Park. (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/11 2:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to16 Motion to Dismiss due on or before 7/25/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/11/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/11 12:46 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Teller County Short-Term Rental Alliance. (Illingworth, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 07/11 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David William Illingworth, II on behalf of Teller County Short-Term Rental AllianceAttorney David William Illingworth, II added to party Teller County Short-Term Rental Alliance(pty:pla) (Illingworth, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Thu 06/20 1:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant City of Woodland Park. (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
15 15 utility Terminate Party - PUBLIC Wed 06/05 5:34 PM
Defendants City Council of Woodland Park, Hilary LaBarre, Frank Connors, Robert Zuluaga, Catherine Nakai, Carrol Harvey, Kellie Case, Rusty Neal, and Aaron Vassalotti terminated pursuant to14 Stipulation to Dismiss Certain Defendants filed on 6/4/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Party Tue 06/04 12:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party of Certain Defendants by Defendants Kellie Case, City Council of Woodland Park, Frank Connors, Carrol Harvey, Hilary LaBarre, Catherine Nakai, Rusty Neal, Aaron Vassalotti, Robert Zuluaga. (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 05/31 3:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants must answer or otherwise respond to3 Complaint on or before 6/20/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/31/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/30 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Submission of State District Court Docket by Defendants Kellie Case, City Council of Woodland Park, City of Woodland Park, Frank Connors, Carrol Harvey, Hilary LaBarre, Catherine Nakai, Rusty Neal, Aaron Vassalotti, Robert Zuluaga (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Tue 05/21 4:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Kellie Case, City Council of Woodland Park, City of Woodland Park, Frank Connors, Carrol Harvey, Hilary LaBarre, Catherine Nakai, Rusty Neal, Aaron Vassalotti, Robert Zuluaga. (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs order Order Tue 05/21 3:45 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/15/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 5/21/2024. (evaug)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
9 9 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/20 1:35 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/20/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Mon 05/20 11:53 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jrobe, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Letter Reassigning Case Mon 05/20 11:53 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-01381-DDD. (Text only entry.) (jrobe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
6 6 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 05/17 9:01 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 05/17 9:00 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs misc Order - State Court Fri 05/17 8:59 AM
STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, by Scott A Sells, District Court Judge, Teller County, on 05/07/2024. Defendants shall have until and including May 21, 2024, to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. (blaws)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 05/17 8:56 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Kellie Case, City Council of Woodland Park, City of Woodland Park, Frank Connors, Carrol Harvey, Hilary LaBarre, Catherine Nakai, Rusty Neal, Aaron Vassalotti, Robert Zuluaga, filed by Teller County Short-Term Rental Alliance. (blaws)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Fri 05/17 8:56 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/16 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ROBERT ZULUAGA, AARON VASSALOTTI, CITY COUNCIL OF WOODLAND PARK, CATHERINE NAKAI, KELLIE CASE, City of Woodland Park, CARROL HARVEY, HILARY LaBARRE, RUSTY NEAL, FRANKN CONNORS from District Court, Teller County, Case Number 2024CV030016. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9690383), filed by ROBERT ZULUAGA, AARON VASSALOTTI, CITY COUNCIL OF WOODLAND PARK, CATHERINE NAKAI, KELLIE CASE, City of Woodland Park, CARROL HARVEY, HILARY LaBARRE, RUSTY NEAL, FRANKN CONNORS.(Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Exhibit 1 Ordinance 1469,
Att: 4 Exhibit C District Court Civil Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit D District Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit E Waiver and Acceptance of Service by Attorney,
Att: 7 Exhibit F Entry of Appearance,
Att: 8 Exhibit G Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension,
Att: 9 Exhibit H Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension,
Att: 10 Exhibit I Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal