California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:24-cv-01071
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Mazda Motor Corporation
Defendant
Mazda Motor of America, Inc.
Represented By
Darlene M. Cho
Shook, Hardy And Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Meshullam Wallace
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Abigail J. Gertner
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Nathan N. Kiyam
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Russell D. Paul
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Danielle Reed
Represented By
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Alberto Llerena
Represented By
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tania Herrera
Represented By
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Cecilia DeBarberie
Represented By
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian DeBarberie
Represented By
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandra Yankow
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Abigail J. Gertner
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Nathan N. Kiyam
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Russell D. Paul
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melody Kaufman
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Abigail J. Gertner
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Nathan N. Kiyam
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Russell D. Paul
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Rohan
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Abigail J. Gertner
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Nathan N. Kiyam
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Russell D. Paul
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise Rohan
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Abigail J. Gertner
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Nathan N. Kiyam
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Russell D. Paul
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Regnier
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Abigail J. Gertner
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Nathan N. Kiyam
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Russell D. Paul
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Calen Regnier
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Abigail J. Gertner
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Nathan N. Kiyam
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Russell D. Paul
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Kaufman
Represented By
Amey J. Park
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Laura Ellen Goolsby
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Abigail J. Gertner
Berger Montague PC
contact info
Cody R Padgett
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Nathan N. Kiyam
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Tarek H. Zohdy
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Russell D. Paul
Berger Montague PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
40 40 stip Dismiss Case Tue 03/18 12:58 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Danielle Reed, Brian DeBarberie, Cecilia DeBarberie, Tania Herrera, Alberto Llerena, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Sandra Yankow, Ryan Kaufman, Melody Kaufman, Meshullam Wallace, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier.(Padgett, Cody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 8:40 AM
ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MNAO'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING DATE by Judge John W. Holcomb38 . The Court, having reviewed the Parties' Joint Stipulation for a Further Order Extending the Briefing Schedule for MNAO's motion to dismiss and Hearing Date, and good cause appearing therefore, hereby ORDERS that the schedule is MODIFIED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
38 38 4 pgs stip Order Mon 02/24 2:07 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Further Extending Briefing Schedule for MNAO's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Hearing Date filed by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Mallow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 02/24 12:46 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cody R Padgett counsel for Plaintiffs Danielle Reed, Brian DeBarberie, Cecilia DeBarberie, Tania Herrera, Alberto Llerena, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Sandra Yankow, Ryan Kaufman, Melody Kaufman, Meshullam Wallace, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier. Laura E. Goolsby is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs. (Attorney Cody R Padgett added to party Danielle Reed(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R Padgett added to party Brian DeBarberie(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R Padgett added to party Cecilia DeBarberie(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R Padgett added to party Tania Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R Padgett added to party Alberto Llerena(pty:pla))(Padgett, Cody)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 02/24 12:44 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cody R Padgett counsel for Plaintiffs Danielle Reed, Brian DeBarberie, Cecilia DeBarberie, Tania Herrera, Alberto Llerena, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Sandra Yankow, Ryan Kaufman, Melody Kaufman, Meshullam Wallace, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier. Tarek H. Zohdy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs. (Padgett, Cody)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
35 35 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Mon 02/03 8:51 AM
ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MNAO'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING DATE34 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court, hereby ORDERS that the schedule for briefing and hearing on MNAO's motion to dismiss is MODIFIED as follow: Deadline for MNAO to file motion to dismiss amended complaint 2/25/2025. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file opposition to motion 4/4/2025. Deadline for MNAO to file reply brief 4/28/2025. Hearing date for motion 5/16/2025 at 9:00 a.m. (es)
Related: [-]
34 34 4 pgs stip Order Fri 01/31 11:11 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Further Extending Briefing Schedule for MNAO's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Hearing Date filed by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Mallow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
33 33 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Thu 01/23 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Abigail J. Gertner counsel for Plaintiffs Danielle Reed, Brian DeBarberie, Cecilia DeBarberie, Tania Herrera, Alberto Llerena, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Sandra Yankow, Ryan Kaufman, Melody Kaufman, Meshullam Wallace, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier. Changing Firm Name to Capstone Law APC, 1875 Century Park East, Suite 1000, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Changing E-mail and Fax Number to Abigail.Gertner@capstonelawyers.com, Fax: (310) 943-0396. Filed by Plaintiffs Danielle Reed, Brian DeBarberie, Cecilia DeBarberie, Tania Herrera, Alberto Llerena, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Sandra Yankow, Ryan Kaufman, Melody Kaufman, Meshullam Wallace, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier. (Attorney Abigail J. Gertner added to party Danielle Reed(pty:pla), Attorney Abigail J. Gertner added to party Brian DeBarberie(pty:pla), Attorney Abigail J. Gertner added to party Cecilia DeBarberie(pty:pla), Attorney Abigail J. Gertner added to party Tania Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Abigail J. Gertner added to party Alberto Llerena(pty:pla))(Gertner, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/17 4:43 PM
ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MNAO'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING DATE31 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The deadline to file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint is 2/4/2025. The hearing date on the motion is 4/25/2025 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
31 31 4 pgs stip Order Thu 01/16 2:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Further Extending Briefing Schedule for MNAO's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Hearing Date filed by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Attorney Michael L. Mallow added to party Mazda Motor of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mallow, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order Fri 11/01 1:43 PM
ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MNAO'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING DATE29 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court, having reviewed the Parties ' Joint Stipulation for a Further Order Extending the Briefing Schedule for MNAO's motion to dismiss and Hearing Date, and good cause appearing therefore, HEREBY ENTERS THE FOLLOWING SCHEDULE: The deadline for MNAO to file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint is 1/7/25. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their opposition to the motion is 2/14/25. The deadline for MNAO to file reply brief is 3/17/2025. The hearing date on the motion is 4/4/2025 at 9:00 am. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
29 29 4 pgs stip Order Wed 10/30 11:50 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Further Extending Briefing Schedule for MNAO's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Hearing Date filed by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Cho, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Thu 09/26 10:07 AM
ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MNAO'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING DATE27 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court, having reviewed the Parties Joint Stipulation for a Further Order Extending the Briefing Schedule for MNAO's motion to dismiss and Hearing Date, and good cause appearing therefore, hereby ORDERS that the schedule for MNAOs motion to dismiss is EXTENDED as follows: The deadline for MNAO to file motion to dismiss amended complaint is 11/5/2024. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file opposition to motion is 12/13/2024. The deadline for MNAO to file reply brief if 1/13/2025. The hearing date for motion is 1/31/2025 at 9:00 am. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
27 27 4 pgs stip Order Tue 09/24 3:18 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Further Extending Briefing Schedule for MNAO's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Hearing Date filed by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Cho, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Wed 09/11 2:39 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MNAO'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING DATE25 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court, having reviewed the Parties' Joint Stipulation for an Order Extending the Briefing Deadlines for MNAO's motion to dismiss and Hearing Date, and good cause appearing therefore, hereby ORDERS that schedule for briefing and hearing on MNAO's motion is EXTENDED as follows: Deadline for MNAO to file motion to dismiss amended complaint: 10/1/24. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file opposition to motion: 11/8/24. Deadline for MNAO to file reply brief: 12/9/24. Hearing date for motion 12/27/24 at 9:00 a.m. (rolm)
Related: [-]
25 25 4 pgs stip Order Wed 09/11 11:02 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Order Extending Briefing Schedule for MNAO's motion to dismiss and hearing date filed by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Cho, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
24 24 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 08/13 2:53 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 , filed by Plaintiffs Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow, Calen Regnier, Nathan Rohan, Tiffany Regnier, Ryan Kaufman, Denise Rohan, Melody Kaufman, Danielle Reed, Brian DeBarberie, Cecilia DeBarberie, Tania Herrera, Alberto Llerena(Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Danielle Reed(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Tania Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Alberto Llerena(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Brian DeBarberie(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Cecilia DeBarberie(pty:pla))( Goolsby, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consumer Complaints to NHTSA,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Other Consumer Complaints
Monday, July 15, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/16 9:25 AM
ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR (1) FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE RE: MNAO'S RESPONSE22 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The deadline for plaintiffs to file an amended complaint is 8/13/2024. The deadline for MNAO to respond to the amended complaint is 9/17/2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs stip Order Mon 07/15 12:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order SETTING DEADLINES FOR (1) FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE RE: MNAOS RESPONSE filed by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc..(Attorney Darlene M. Cho added to party Mazda Motor of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cho, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 13, 2024
21 21 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 06/13 3:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS of Non-Resident Attorneys Amey J. Park, Russell D. Paul and Abigail J. Gertner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow17 ,18 , and19 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
20 20 misc Return Receipt of Certified Mail (Non-Complaint) Wed 06/12 12:55 PM
RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL showing delivery of Notice Letter upon Oregon Attorney General, received by Pedro Juarez on June 3, 2024. ( Goolsby, Laura)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 06/12 11:57 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Russell D. Paul to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37643064) filed by Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow. (Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 06/12 11:50 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amey J. Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37642942) filed by Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow. (Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 06/12 11:40 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Abigail J. Gertner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37642462) filed by Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow. (Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Melody Kaufman(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Ryan Kaufman(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Calen Regnier(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Tiffany Regnier(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Denise Rohan(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Nathan Rohan(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Meshullam Wallace(pty:pla), Attorney Tarek H. Zohdy added to party Sandra Yankow(pty:pla)) (Zohdy, Tarek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 24, 2024
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/24 2:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow, Calen Regnier, Nathan Rohan, Tiffany Regnier, Ryan Kaufman, Denise Rohan, Melody Kaufman. upon Mazda Motor of America, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/24/2024, answer due 7/23/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Darlene M. Cho. ( Goolsby, Laura)
Related: [-]
15 15 attorney Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 05/24 9:55 AM
RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Amey J. Park on behalf of Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Additional time is needed to obtain original certificates of good standing. Once obtained, the application will be promptly submitted to the Court. (lt)
Related: [-]
14 14 attorney Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 05/24 9:52 AM
RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Abigail J. Gertner on behalf of Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Additional time is needed to obtain original certificates of good standing. Once obtained, the application will be promptly submitted to the Court. (lt)
Related: [-]
13 13 attorney Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 05/24 9:50 AM
RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Russell D. Paul on behalf of Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Additional time is needed to obtain original certificates of good standing. Once obtained, the application will be promptly submitted to the Court. (lt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 05/20 9:02 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 05/17 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Amey J. Park on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
10 10 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 05/17 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Abigail J. Gertner on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Fri 05/17 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Russell D. Paul on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/17 4:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation, Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 05/17 4:30 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 05/17 4:29 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 05/17 4:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 05/16 4:19 PM
Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, ( Goolsby, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 05/16 4:16 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,1 filed by Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow. ( Goolsby, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 05/16 4:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Melody Kaufman, Ryan Kaufman, Calen Regnier, Tiffany Regnier, Denise Rohan, Nathan Rohan, Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow. ( Goolsby, Laura)
Related: [-]
1 1 110 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 05/16 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37485660 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Meshullam Wallace, Sandra Yankow, Calen Regnier, Nathan Rohan, Tiffany Regnier, Ryan Kaufman, Denise Rohan, Melody Kaufman. (Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Melody Kaufman(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Ryan Kaufman(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Calen Regnier(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Tiffany Regnier(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Denise Rohan(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Nathan Rohan(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Meshullam Wallace(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Ellen Goolsby added to party Sandra Yankow(pty:pla))( Goolsby, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consumer Complaints to NHTSA,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Other Consumer Complaints