New York Western District Court
Judge:John L Sinatra, Jr
Referred: Leslie G Foschio
Case #: 1:24-cv-00474
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Terminated:Jul 08, 2024
Case in other court:Supreme Court, Monroe County, E2024007129
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Todd Baxter
Terminated: 07/08/2024
Monroe County Law Department 39 West Main Street Suite 307
Rochester, NY 14614
Represented By
Robert John Shoemaker
Monroe County Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Nicholas Priolo
Terminated: 07/08/2024
Monroe County Law Department 39 W. Main Street Suite 307
Rochester, NY 14614
Represented By
Robert John Shoemaker
Monroe County Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Richard Roe
Terminated: 07/08/2024
Plaintiff
Alexander Megens-Sedor
Terminated: 07/08/2024
Elliot Dolby Shields, Esq. 192 Lexington Avenue Suite 802
New York, NY 10024
Represented By
Elliot Dolby Shields
Roth & Roth, LLP
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 08, 2024
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Mon 07/08 3:20 PM
Intradistrict Transfer to Rochester Division, new case number is 6:24-cv-6425-CJS. (SG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
8 8 order Text Order Wed 07/03 11:16 AM
TEXT ORDER directing the Clerk of Court, in this Court's discretion, to reassign this matter to a District Judge in Rochester. The parties' joint motion to change venue (Dkt. 7) is denied as moot. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 7/3/2024. (KLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
7 7 motion Change Venue Tue 07/02 1:26 PM
First MOTION to Change Venue from Buffalo to Rochester, by stipulation of all parties by Alexander Megens-Sedor.(Shields, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Stipulation to change venue from Buffalo to Rochester
Friday, May 31, 2024
6 6 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/31 3:11 PM
ORDER. Each party, including any party appearing for themselves without counsel, shall provide to the court, either jointly or separately, a proposed case management order not later than 7/9/2024 for the purpose of entry of a case management order as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b). Upon receipt of the proposed case management orders, a Scheduling Order will be prepared and filed by the court. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 5/31/2024. (SDW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/22 5:39 PM
TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 5/22/2024. (KLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 05/21 9:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Elliot Dolby Shields on May 16, 2024, filed by Todd Baxter, Nicholas Priolo. (Shoemaker, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Thu 05/16 3:49 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] .' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Thu 05/16 3:49 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
3 3 NOTICE by Todd Baxter, Nicholas Priolo re1 Notice of Removal, Index of State Court Filing (Shoemaker, Robert)
Related: [-]
E-Filing Notification: re1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). (TMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
2 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Todd Baxter, Nicholas Priolo.(Shoemaker, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court, Monroe County, case number E2024007129. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5180858), filed by All Defendants.(Shoemaker, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet