Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Emily C Marks
Referred: Kelly F Pate
Case #: 3:24-cv-00285
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 2:37 AM CST
Defendant
ATR Auto Transport & Recovery
15447 US 280 East
Smith Station, AL 36877
Plaintiff
Qiana Glenn
802 W Longleaf Drive Unit 54
Auburn, AL 36832


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
13 13 order Judgment Thu 03/13 11:15 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order entered on this date adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/13/2025. (CWL)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 03/13 11:14 AM
ORDERED that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (doc. 11 ) is ADOPTED, and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for the Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Orders of the Court. A separate Final Judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 3/13/2025. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Mon 12/09 1:30 PM
No objections received re11 Recommendation. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 11/22 11:44 AM
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this case be dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to file an amended complaint as ordered by the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 11/22/2024. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 10/25 3:26 PM
ORDERED Plf file an Amended Complaint on or before November 8, 2024, that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the following requirements of this Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/25/2024. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Wed 10/16 1:25 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re8 Order, sent to Qiana Glenn. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 09/30 2:21 PM
ORDER Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint on or before October 14, 2024, that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the following requirements of this Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 9/30/2024. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/01 7:35 AM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that the 3 motions are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to STAY service of process so the Court may conduct its obligatory review of Plaintiff's Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 7/1/2024. (CWL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/17 3:26 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, this case is REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/17/2024. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
1 1 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/16 4:53 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate as Referring Judge. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
5 5 service Proposed Summons Thu 05/16 4:58 PM
Proposed Summons as to ATR Auto Transport & Recovery. (LAB)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit Thu 05/16 4:57 PM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Qiana Glenn. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application
3 3 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Thu 05/16 4:56 PM
Conflict Disclosure Statement filed by Qiana Glenn re2 Complaint. (LAB)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against ATR Auto Transport & Recovery, filed by Qiana Glenn. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/12/2024. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A