Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00682
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 2:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Gustavo Flores-Valdez (1)
Represented By
Vanessa Mendoza
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Material Witness
Felipe Moran-Chavez
Represented By
Christopher Sully
Law Office Of Chris Sully
contact info
Material Witness
Enoc Ramirez-Cosino
Represented By
Christopher Sully
Law Office Of Chris Sully
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Devin Victoria Walker
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 4:03 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
Arrest of Gustavo Flores-Valdez, filed. (sas7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 4/26/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (sas7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) USA, Felipe Moran-Chavez, Enoc Ramirez-Cosino as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 4/26/2024 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano, filed. (sas7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
REMARK as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez: MATERIAL WITNESSES CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DREW B. TIPTON, filed. (jl7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Criminal Complaint as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez held on 4/26/2024. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Government moves for temporary detention and continuance to prepare for detention hearing. Court grants. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 4/29/2024 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F. Alanis. The Court advised Defendant of the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally reminded the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; written order to follow. (Time in court: 10:34 10:45) Appearances: Avery Benitez, AUSA; Juan Becerra, AFPD. (PTS: Orlando Montemayor) (ERO: Antonio Tijerina) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla Muzza-Pastor/used) (DUSM: Letty Torres) Deft remanded to custody. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Devin Victoria Walker appearing for USA, filed. (Walker, Devin) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Vanessa Mendoza, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez, filed. (Mendoza, Vanessa) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano: INITIAL APPEARANCE AND DETENTION HEARING OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES): Enoc Ramirez-Cosino AND Felipe Moran-Chavez as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez held on 4/26/2024, Material Witnesses informed of rights. The Court appointed counsel to represent the material witnesses, and counsel, Christopher Sully, was present for the proceedings. The Government moved for detention. The Court heard from the parties regarding the issue of bond. Material Witnesses held without bond, since they are a flight risk, and they have no legal status to be in the United States. Motions to take deposition of material witnesses to be filed. USMS to keep them safe and follow up on any medical needs...Material Witness Hearing set for 4/29/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. Appearances: Avery Benitez, AUSA; Christopher Sully, APPT'D. (PTS: Daisy Montemayor) (ERO: Antonio Tijerina) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla Muzza-Pastor/used) (DUSM: Letty Torres)(Time in Court 9:45 - 9:50). Material Witnesses remanded to the custody of U.S.Marshal., filed. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez, filed. (sas7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
4 4 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Gustavo Flores-Valdez, filed. [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Gustavo Flores-Valdez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 4/29/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Enoc Ramirez-Cosino. Christopher Sully appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Felipe Moran-Chavez. Christopher Sully appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Enoc Ramirez-Cosino to the custody of the United States Marshal. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Felipe Moran-Chavez to the custody of the United States Marshal. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (cr7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
12 12 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (sm7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 28, 2024
13 13 MOTION to Take Deposition of ENOC RAMIREZ-COSINO by Enoc Ramirez-Cosino as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez, filed. (Sully, Christopher) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 MOTION to Take Deposition of FELIPE MORAN-CHAVEZ by Felipe Moran-Chavez as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez, filed. (Sully, Christopher) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing, Material Witness Hearing reset for 5/1/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis; hearings reset due to deft not being medically cleared for court per U.S. Marshals Service, filed. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez: Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing, Material Witness Hearing set for 5/1/2024 at 01:30 PM (nc7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION for Waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention and Waiver of Appearance at the Hearing to Set Material Witnesses for Deposition by Gustavo Flores-Valdez, filed. (Mendoza, Vanessa) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 ORDER granting15 Motion for Waiver as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis.) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER TO DEPOSE MATERIAL WITNESS(ES): Enoc Ramirez-Cosino, Felipe Moran-Chavez on 06/14/2024 as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00687]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
19 19 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez (1) count(s) 1-3, filed. (sas7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
20 20 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez, filed. (sas7)
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Gustavo Flores-Valdez. Arraignment set for 5/23/2024 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis, filed. (sas7)
Related: [-]