USA v. Alvarez
Texas Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 7:24-cr-00664 |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 2:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jose Alvarez (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 4:07 AM CDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
Arrest of Jose Alvarez, filed. (le7) [7:24-mj-00698] | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Jose Alvarez held on 4/29/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Eric Flores, AUSA; Amanda Diane Austin, AFPD. (USPO: Daisy Montemayor) (ERO: Christopher Barrera) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Maria E. Barrett, used) (DUSM: Edgar Hernandez). (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-00698] | ||
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Eric Daniel Flores appearing for USA, filed. (Flores, Eric) [7:24-mj-00698] | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() |