Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00534
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 3:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Tabarez-Mata (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Raul Guerra
Federal Public Defender, Southern District Of Texas
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Ann Francis Booth
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 4:45 AM CDT
Thursday, April 25, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Jose Tabarez-Mata (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 4/26/2024 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (vm5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Jose Tabarez-Mata, filed. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on April 25, 2024 at 03:41 PM as to Jose Tabarez-Mata. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Jose Tabarez-Mata. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Jose Tabarez-Mata added. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Jose Tabarez-Mata held on 4/26/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the Court. Appearances: Tory Sailer AUSA; FPD Ariana Salinas (on duty); USPO: Monica Trevino ; USM: Deputy Enrique Granados. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:30 AM - 9:50 AM) (ERO: Roberto Tenorio) (Interpreter: Juanita Zambrana/Marco Hanson, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Raul Guerra, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jose Tabarez-Mata, filed. (Guerra, Raul) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Jose Tabarez-Mata, filed. Agent: Erin Clay (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jose Tabarez-Mata, filed. (akp5). [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Jose Tabarez-Mata. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Jose Tabarez-Mata. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Jose Tabarez-Mata. Detention Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jose Tabarez-Mata, filed. (akp5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Jose Tabarez-Mata, filed. (akp5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Jose Tabarez-Mata ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (akp5) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Raul Guerra, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jose Tabarez-Mata, filed. (Guerra, Raul) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Ann Francis Booth appearing for USA, filed. (Booth, Ann) [5:24-mj-00537]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
13 13 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jose Tabarez-Mata (1) count(s) 1, filed. (tat5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment