Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00576
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 3:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Elodia Hernandez Zuniga (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Rolando Charles, Jr
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Steven Scott Chamberlin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 4:52 AM CDT
Friday, April 26, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 4/29/2024 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on April 26, 2024 at 11:34 AM as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Elodia Hernandez Zuniga added. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga held on 4/29/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Pretrial recommended Detention. Government concurs. Court sets Detention and Preliminary Examination Hearing. Defendant provided written waivers for the Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Termination of hearings to follow. Appearances: Tori Sailor AUSA; FPD Rolando Charles (on duty); USPTO: Julio Taboada; USM: Deputy Shepherd. (Opened/Adjourned: 10:31 AM - 10:49 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Zeph Pease /Juanita Zambrana, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga, filed. Agent: Michael Grant (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Elodia Hernandez Zuniga, filed. (vm5). [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga. Detention Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Elodia Hernandez Zuniga, filed. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Elodia Hernandez Zuniga in the case of Elodia Hernandez Zuniga, filed. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (vm5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rolando Charles, Jr, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga, filed. (Charles, Rolando) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rolando Charles, Jr, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga, filed. (Charles, Rolando) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Steven Scott Chamberlin appearing for USA, filed. (Chamberlin, Steven) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
13 13 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (am5) [5:24-mj-00539]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
14 14 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Elodia Hernandez Zuniga (1) count(s) 1, filed. (ElliotGallegos, 5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment