New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00699
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 1:33 AM MDT
Defendant
Mauro Isaiah Martinez-Astorga (1)
Represented By
Russell Dean Clark
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alyson Hehr
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 2:59 AM MDT
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
Arrest of Mauro Isaiah Martinez-Astorga (vrr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
Hearing as to Mauro Isaiah Martinez-Astorga: Initial Appearance set for 5/16/2024 at 09:06 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (vrr)
Related: [-]