Indiana Northern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00045
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Hamdeh Chatat (1)
Plaintiff
United States of America


Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 4:30 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
1 1 ORDER ON TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION as to Hamdeh Chatat from the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. Signed by Manish S. Shah on 05/14/2024. (Awaiting signature of accepting judicial officer) (jdb)
Related: [-]