California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:24-cv-02915
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
Fiscala General del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza
Defendant
Raymundo Ventura Garcia
Defendant
Gloria Castillo De La Torre
Defendant
Juan Carlos De Gollado Rodriguez
Defendant
Eduardo Nicolas Mireles Jaime
Defendant
Rodrigo Ivn Acevedo Macas
Defendant
Jonathan Chavez Betancourt
Defendant
Bertha Marine Casillas Martnez
Defendant
Mara de la Luz Castillo de la Torre
Defendant
Centro de Justicia y Empoderamiento para las Mujeres del Gobierno del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza
Defendant
Juan Carlos Degollado Rodrguez
Defendant
Direccin de Seguridad Publica Municipal de Torreon
Defendant
Estados Unidos Mexicanos
Defendant
Judith Arzave Ramirez
Defendant
Gobierno del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza
Defendant
Enrique Vargas Gutirrez
Defendant
Francisco Javier
Defendant
Luis Fernando Macas Montaez
Defendant
Luis Roberto Magaa Orozco
Defendant
Miguel Misael Martinez Anaya
Defendant
Mara Concepcin Mendieta Santos
Defendant
Cristbal Everardo Rodrguez Hernndez
Defendant
Erik Osiris Rodrguez Huitrn
Defendant
Rolando Castaeda Ruiz
Defendant
David Obed Salas Ros
Defendant
Irving Terrazas Molina
Defendant
Virginia Betancourt Rodriguez
Defendant
Bertha Marine Casillas Martinez
Defendant
Jaqueline Reyes Castillo
Defendant
Luis Antonio Castillo Juarez
Defendant
Centro De Justicia Y Empoderamiento Para Las Mujeres de Coahuila
Defendant
Jonathan Chavez Bettancourt
Defendant
Robert Crisp
Defendant
Brenda Karina Cueto Castillo
Defendant
Yolanda De Leon Garcia
Defendant
Francisco Javier Hernandez Favila
Defendant
Claudia Marcela Ibarra Betancourt
Defendant
Luis Fernando Macias Montanez
Defendant
Luis Roberto Magana Orozco
Defendant
Luis Enrique Martin Del Campo Valencia
Defendant
Israhel Martinez Peinado
Defendant
Maria Concepcion Mendieta Santos
Defendant
Pedro Quintero
Defendant
Gilda Reyes Barraza
Defendant
Cristobal Everardo Rodriquez Hernandez
Defendant
Erik Osiris Rodriquez Huitron
Defendant
David Obed Salas Rios
Defendant
Enrique Vargas Gutierrez
Plaintiff
Jason Archie Flickinger, I
Jason Flickinger 1790 Valla Drive San Jose
San Jose, CA 95124

GPO Aug 12 2024
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 8 Ex Parte Application. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on August 12, 2024. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Apr 08 2025
ing (NEF)ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 27 Ex Parte Application for Service by Publication and Extension of Time; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 29 Ex Parte Application for Service by Electronic Means; Acknowledging 31 Status Report. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on April 8, 2025. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Fil

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
54 54 motion Ex Parte Application Thu 05/15 7:07 PM
First Ex Parte Application service by electronic means filed by Jason Archie Flickinger, I.(Flickinger, Jason )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration
53 53 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 05/15 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sandra Ruvalcaba Romero on behalf of Gobierno del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza (Romero, Sandra)
Related: [-]
52 52 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 05/15 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sandra Ruvalcaba Romero on behalf of Fiscala General del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza (Romero, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
51 51 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 05/13 7:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Eric Daniel Mason on behalf of Fiscala General del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza, Gobierno del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza (Mason, Eric)
Related: [-]
50 50 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 05/13 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Babach Lau on behalf of Estados Unidos Mexicanos (Lau, Babach)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
49 49 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/12 7:55 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fiscala General del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza.. (Andrade, Sean)
Related: [-]
48 48 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/12 7:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gobierno del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza.. (Andrade, Sean)
Related: [-]
47 47 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Mon 05/12 7:51 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byFiscala General del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza, Gobierno del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza. Related [+] (Andrade, Sean)
Related: [-] 46
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
46 46 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 05/12 7:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fiscala General del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza, Gobierno del Estado de Coahuila de Zaragoza. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 5/27/2025. Replies due by 6/3/2025.(Andrade, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 08, 2025
45 45 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/08 10:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Archie Flickinger, I. Rodrigo Ivn Acevedo Macas served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Judith Arzave Ramirez served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Bertha Marine Casillas Martinez served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Jaqueline Reyes Castillo served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Yolanda De Leon Garcia served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Juan Carlos Degollado Rodrguez served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Francisco Javier Hernandez Favila served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Claudia Marcela Ibarra Betancourt served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Luis Fernando Macias Montanez served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Luis Roberto Magana Orozco served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Israhel Martinez Peinado served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Maria Concepcion Mendieta Santos served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Erik Osiris Rodriquez Huitron served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025; Irving Terrazas Molina served on 4/9/2025, answer due 6/8/2025.(Flickinger, Jason )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 6 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 7 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 8 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 9 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 10 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 11 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 12 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 13 Certificate/Proof of Service
44 44 oth_evt Clerk's Declination of Default Thu 05/08 4:41 PM
Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT: No certificate of service has been provided.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+](msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-] (s)39