Original Case: 2:20-cv-00004

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-04051
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 2:16 AM MDT
Defendant
MARY O'TOOLE, an individual
Represented By
Scott Sweeney
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM BOWSER, an individual
Represented By
William Bowser
contact info
Defendant
GABRIEL MANAGEMENT, a Utah corporation, C/O William James Bowser
Represented By
Gabriel Management
contact info
Defendant
J&J CUBIT CONSTRUCTION, a Utah Corporation
Represented By
Ron J. Noyes
RJN Law
contact info
Joseph Marion Stultz
York Howell & Guymon
contact info
Defendant
BRANDON M. JENSEN, an individual
Represented By
Ron J. Noyes
RJN Law
contact info
Joseph Marion Stultz
York Howell & Guymon
contact info
Defendant
ROCKWELL DEBT FREE PROPERTIES, a Utah Corporation
Represented By
Royce B. Covington
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Sara M. Nielson
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Jonathan O. Hafen
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Defendant
SCOTT JENSEN, an individual
Represented By
Ron J. Noyes
RJN Law
contact info
Joseph Marion Stultz
York Howell & Guymon
contact info
Defendant
ROCKWELL TIC, a Utah Corporation
Represented By
Sara M. Nielson
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Jonathan O. Hafen
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
contact info
Defendant
JOHN D. HAMRICK, an individual
Represented By
Scott Sweeney
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
CHRIS BROWN, an individual
Represented By
Scott Sweeney
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
TM 1031 EXCHANGE, a California Corporation
Represented By
Scott Sweeney
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
TIM MARSHALL, an individual
Represented By
Scott Sweeney
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
O'TOOLE ENTERPRISES, a New Hampshire limited liability company
Represented By
Scott Sweeney
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant
EDMUND & WHEELER, a New Hampshire Corporation
Represented By
Scott Sweeney
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
KIRSTEN PARKIN, an individual
Represented By
David W. Tufts
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Douglas W. Henkin
Dentons
contact info
J. Tayler Fox
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Nebraska Corporation
Represented By
David W. Tufts
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Douglas W. Henkin
Dentons
contact info
J. Tayler Fox
Dentons Durham Jones Pinegar
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
IVY S. FASKO, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PETER BOLI, trustee of the Boli Family Trust Dated 5/13/1987
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
EC9 HOLDINGS, a Florida limited liability company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SUSAN M. WRIGHT, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIAM G. WRIGHT, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOHN MICHAEL LALLI, III, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TRACY L. ADAME, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROCK NOAH OH LLC, an Ohio Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LINDA DIGIACOMO, trustee of The Michael Digiacomo and Linda Digiacomo Revocable Trust (3/20/2001)
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL DIGIACOMO, trustee of The Michael Digiacomo and Linda Digiacomo Revocable Trust (3/20/2001)
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HENRYK SARAT, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DONNA M. LILLMARS, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CRAIG A. COUSINS, trustee of The Craig A. Cousins Trust, UTD 5/29/2014
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
R&J STECK INVESTMENTS, a Utah limited liability company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ALAN SESHIKI, trustee of The 2016 Seshiki Family Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ALMA SESHIKI, trustee of The 2016 Seshiki Family Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MERLE L. STEINMAN, JR., an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS E. FUNK, trustee of the Stephen W. Funk T/U/A Dated 3/18/2005 TBO Thomas E Funk
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JUDY HENDRIX, trustee of The Hendrix Living Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
OAK HILL MANAGEMENT, a Vermont Corporation
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THEODORE E. KEITH, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DENA KEITH, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HARVEY A. PAUL, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DONALD P. SMITH, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROSEMARY B. SMITH, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LUANN PROPERTIES, a Georgia Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LINDA M. GRECO, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BP412 LLC, an Ohio Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
W. MARK MCKOY, trustee of The W. Mark McKoy Irrevocable Trust of 2012
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AMFIL REALTY, a New York Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GARY R. NEIL, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BERNIE BROMBERG, trustee of The Bromberg Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LIEM QUANG LE, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GENEVIEVE SMITH, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANSON SMITH, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
G. SCOTT COLEMAN, an individual and trustee of the G. Scott Coleman Trust (12/1/04)
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
E&H JACKSON LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS B. TARBET, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROSS R. GRECO, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BARNEY ADDAMO, trustee of The Addamo 12/9/04 Family Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOSIE ADDAMO, trustee of The Addamo 12/9/04 Family Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SUSAN SPIRITUS, trustee of the Spiritus Revocable Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
EUGENE SPIRITUS, trustee of the Spiritus Revocable Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NINA D. JOHANNESSEN, trustee of the Nina D. Johannessen Living Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SUSAN HARDER, trustee of the Richard and Susan Harder Living Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RICHARD HARDER, trustee of the Richard and Susan Harder Living Trust
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AMBLESIDE PARK, a New Hampshire corporation
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RYAN V. ANDREASEN, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CARL A. LILLMARS, JR., an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RUSSELL M. TALBOT, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LAWRENCE H. TALBOT, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JENNIFER SAMSON, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEAN PIERRE SAMSON, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
VOYNOVICH VENTURES, a New York Limited Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HENRY NOAHS DUBLIN LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEAN M. BONETTI, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ARMENAY FAYE MERRITT, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NORMAN L. MERRITT, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER C. FUCCI, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GERTRAUDE WINKLER, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THE REAL MINT, a Virginia Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARTIN TIERNEY, trustees of The Tierney Revocable Living Trust u/t/d 8/20/18
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LINDA TIERNEY, trustees of The Tierney Revocable Living Trust u/t/d 8/20/18
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MAXON-MULTILINE, a Florida Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TIMOTHY D. MAXON, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PRUDENCE MAXON, an individual
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LOUIS ZAMBITO, Trustee of The Joseph and Grace Zambito Family Trust (6/26/15)
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PAUL ZAMBITO, Trustee of The Joseph and Grace Zambito Family Trust (6/26/15)
Represented By
Reid W. Lambert
Strong & Hanni
contact info
R. Jesse Davis
Strong & Hanni
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 2:16 AM MDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
[11090511] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/15/2024 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 05/29/2024 for First American Title Insurance Company and Kirsten Parkin. Notice of appearance due on 05/29/2024 for Tracy L. Adame, Barney Addamo, Josie Addamo, AmFil Realty, Ambleside Park, Ryan V. Andreasen, BP412 LLC, Peter Boli, Jean M. Bonetti, Bernie Bromberg, G. Scott Coleman, Craig A. Cousins, Linda Digiacomo, Michael Digiacomo, E&H Jackson LLC, EC9 Holdings, Ivy S. Fasko, Christopher C. Fucci, Thomas E. Funk, Linda M. Greco, Ross R. Greco, Richard Harder, Susan Harder, Judy Hendrix, Henry Noahs Dublin LLC, Nina D. Johannessen, Dena Keith, Theodore E. Keith, John Michael Lalli III, Liem Quang Le, Carl A. Lillmars Jr., Donna M. Lillmars, Luann Properties, Prudence Maxon, Timothy D. Maxon, Maxon-Multiline, W. Mark McKoy, Armenay Faye Merritt, Norman L. Merritt, Gary R. Neil, Mary O'Toole, Oak Hill Management, Harvey A. Paul, R&J Steck Investments, Rock Noah Oh LLC, Jean Pierre Samson, Jennifer Samson, Henryk Sarat, Alan Seshiki, Alma Seshiki, Anson Smith, Donald P. Smith, Genevieve Smith, Rosemary B. Smith, Eugene Spiritus, Susan Spiritus, Merle L. Steinman Jr., Lawrence H. Talbot, Russell M. Talbot, Thomas B. Tarbet, The Real Mint, Linda Tierney, Martin Tierney, Voynovich Ventures, Gertraude Winkler, Susan M. Wright, William G. Wright, Louis Zambito and Paul Zambito. Disclosure statement due on 05/29/2024 for AmFil Realty, Ambleside Park, BP412 LLC, E&H Jackson LLC, EC9 Holdings, First American Title Insurance Company, Henry Noahs Dublin LLC, Luann Properties, Maxon-Multiline, Oak Hill Management, R&J Steck Investments, Rock Noah Oh LLC, The Real Mint and Voynovich Ventures 24-4051
Related: [-]
Att: 1 154 pgs Preliminary Record
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil