Original Case: 8:22-cv-02597

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.us-01447
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 17, 2024 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINSTRATION
Represented By
Frances Bishop Morris
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Samuel R. Vice
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Roann Nichols
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEPHANIE POLLACK, in her capacity as Acting Administrator of the Federal Highway Administration
Represented By
Frances Bishop Morris
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Samuel R. Vice
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Roann Nichols
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY MURRILL, in his official capacity as Maryland Division Administrator of the Federal Highway Administration
Represented By
Frances Bishop Morris
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Samuel R. Vice
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Roann Nichols
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARYLAND DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By
Fred R. Wagner
VENABLE, LLP
contact info
Linda DeVuono
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND
contact info
Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
VENABLE, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES F. PORTS, JR., in his official capacity as Secretary of the Maryland Department of Transportation
Represented By
Fred R. Wagner
VENABLE, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Catherine Rinehart
VENABLE, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FRIENDS OF MOSES HALL
Plaintiff
NORTHERN VIRGINIA CITIZENS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Andrea C. Ferster
contact info
David Christopher Tobin
TOBIN, O'CONNOR & CONCINO PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARYLAND CHAPTER OF THE SIERRA CLUB, part of Sierra Club, Inc.
Represented By
Jared Knicley
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Nanding Chen
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Elizabeth Sherrill Merritt
NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION
contact info
Andrea C. Ferster
contact info
Peter James DeMarco
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Atid Kimelman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION IN THE UNITED STATES
Represented By
Jared Knicley
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Nanding Chen
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Elizabeth Sherrill Merritt
NATIONAL TRUST FOR HISTORIC PRESERVATION
contact info
Andrea C. Ferster
contact info
Peter James DeMarco
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Atid Kimelman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INCORPORATED
Represented By
Jared Knicley
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Nanding Chen
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Peter James DeMarco
NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
contact info
Atid Kimelman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 4:16 AM EDT
Thursday, May 16, 2024
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:22-cv-02597-DKC. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001570043] 24-1447 RP [Entered: 05/16/2024 03:19 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case Originating case number: 8:22-cv-02597-DKC. Mailed to: Nanding Chen, Andrea Ferster, Atid Kimelman, Elizabeth Merritt, Samuel Vice, and Fred Wagner. [1001570050] 24-1447 RP [Entered: 05/16/2024 03:21 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Nanding Chen, Andrea Ferster, Atid Kimelman, Elizabeth Merritt, Samuel Vice, and Fred Wagner. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide. [1001570052] Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/25/2024. Response Brief due 07/25/2024. 24-1447 RP [Entered: 05/16/2024 03:23 PM]
Related: [-]