Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 1:24-cv-00879
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2024 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
Bon Secours Mercy Health Foundation
Represented By
Erin Siebenhar Hess
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Daniel C. Egger
Reminger - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Bon Secours Mercy Health Medical Group LLC
Represented By
Erin Siebenhar Hess
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Daniel C. Egger
Reminger - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc.
Represented By
Erin Siebenhar Hess
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Daniel C. Egger
Reminger - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Mercy Health - Regional Medical Center, LLC
Represented By
Erin Siebenhar Hess
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Daniel C. Egger
Reminger - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Deputy Robert Moderwell
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Phil R. Stammitti
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Corrections Nurse John Allen
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Corrections Officer Yvette Beckwith
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Corrections Nurse fnu Brooks
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
John M. Doan
Represented By
Tammi J. Lees
Roetzel & Andress - Cleveland
contact info
Anna Carulas
Roetzel & Andress
contact info
Lacy Leduc
Roetzel & Andress
contact info
Defendant
Corrections Officer Ryan Frizell
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Corrections Sergeant Cenu Glover
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Corrections Officer Eric Hollis
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Corrections Officer Jason Jancsura
Represented By
David M. Smith
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Nicholas J. Hanek
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
Darian Ayala Velazquez
Represented By
Matthew D. Besser
Bolek Besser Glesius
contact info
Jeremy A. Tor
Spangenberg, Shibley & Liber
contact info
Nicholas A. DiCello
Spangenberg, Shibley & Liber
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
24 24 service Subpoena Returned Executed Wed 04/16 3:26 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Lorain County Children Services by FedEx Priority Overnight on 4/14/25 filed on behalf of Bon Secours Mercy Health Foundation (Hess, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Thu 04/03 12:02 PM
Notice of Service of Dr. Doan's Discovery requests to Plaintiff filed by John M. Doan. (Lees, Tammi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Wed 03/12 4:39 PM
Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by John Allen, Yvette Beckwith, fnu Brooks, Ryan Frizell, Cenu Glover, Eric Hollis, Jason Jancsura, Robert Moderwell, Phil R. Stammitti. (Janack, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Wed 02/05 4:32 PM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by fnu Brooks, Phil R. Stammitti, Robert Moderwell, Yvette Beckwith, John Allen, Eric Hollis, Jason Jancsura, Ryan Frizell, Cenu Glover. (Janack, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Fri 01/31 2:53 PM
First Notice of Service of Notice of Service regarding Defendants Initial Disclosures filed by Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc.. (Hess, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
19 19 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 01/16 1:18 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) and L.R. 16.3(b)(3) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Tor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
18 18 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 01/07 1:50 PM
Attorney Appearance by Matthew R. Janack filed by on behalf of fnu Brooks, Phil R. Stammitti, Robert Moderwell, Yvette Beckwith, John Allen, Eric Hollis, Jason Jancsura, Ryan Frizell, Cenu Glover. (Janack, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/22 4:16 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by John M. Doan. Related document(s)1 . (Lees, Tammi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 07/23 8:07 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's16 Unopposed Motion for leave For 30-Day Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint . John M. Doan answer due 8/22/2024. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 7/23/2024.(S,SR)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
16 16 motion Leave Mon 07/22 4:34 PM
Unopposed Motion for leave For 30-Day Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant John M. Doan. (Lees, Tammi)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/15 1:13 PM
Answer to1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by John Allen, Yvette Beckwith, fnu Brooks, Ryan Frizell, Cenu Glover, Eric Hollis, Jason Jancsura, Robert Moderwell, Phil R. Stammitti. (Smith, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
14 14 service Return of Service Executed Wed 07/03 8:17 AM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon John M. Doan on 7/2/2024, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
13 13 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 06/18 3:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mercy Health - Regional Medical Center, LLC. (Hess, Erin)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 06/18 3:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bon Secours Mercy Health Medical Group LLC. (Hess, Erin)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 06/18 3:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc.. (Hess, Erin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 06/18 3:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bon Secours Mercy Health Foundation. (Hess, Erin)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/18 2:56 PM
Joint Answer to1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Bon Secours Mercy Health Foundation, Bon Secours Mercy Health Medical Group LLC, Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc., Mercy Health - Regional Medical Center, LLC. (Hess, Erin)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Tue 06/18 1:41 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Eric Hollis, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Tue 06/18 1:40 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon John Allen, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 06/17 10:51 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants'6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer. John Allen, Yvette Beckwith, fnu Brooks, Ryan Frizell, Cenu Glover, Eric Hollis, Jason Jancsura, Robert Moderwell, and Phil R. Stammitti answer due 7/15/2024. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 6/17/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
6 6 motion Extension (answer complaint) Fri 06/14 7:46 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 15, 2024 to answer filed by John Allen, Yvette Beckwith, fnu Brooks, Ryan Frizell, Cenu Glover, Eric Hollis, Jason Jancsura, Robert Moderwell, Phil R. Stammitti. Related document(s)1 . (Hanek, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Wed 06/05 12:21 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon John Allen on 6/3/2024; Eric Hollis on 6/3/2024, filed on behalf of Darian Ayala Velazquez (Tor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Wed 05/29 7:46 AM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Bon Secours Mercy Health Foundation on 5/28/2024; Bon Secours Mercy Health Medical Group LLC on 5/28/2024; Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc. on 5/28/2024; Mercy Health - Regional Medical Center, LLC on 5/28/2024, filed on behalf of Darian Ayala Velazquez Related document(s)1 . (Tor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Wed 05/29 7:44 AM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Yvette Beckwith on 5/25/2024; fnu Brooks on 5/25/2024; Ryan Frizell on 5/25/2024; Cenu Glover on 5/25/2024; Jason Jancsura on 5/25/2024; Robert Moderwell on 5/25/2024; Phil R. Stammitti on 5/25/2024, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s)1 . (Tor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 05/17 1:29 PM
Original Summonses and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon John Allen, Yvette Beckwith, Bon Secours Mercy Health Foundation, Bon Secours Mercy Health Medical Group LLC, Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc., fnu Brooks, John M. Doan, Ryan Frizell, Cenu Glover, Eric Hollis, Jason Jancsura, Mercy Health - Regional Medical Center, LLC, Robert Moderwell, Phil R. Stammitti.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/17 11:27 AM
Complaint with jury demand against John Allen, Yvette Beckwith, Bon Secours Mercy Health Foundation, Bon Secours Mercy Health Medical Group LLC, Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc., Unknown Brooks, John M. Doan, Ryan Frizell, Cenu Glover, Eric Hollis, Jason Jancsura, Mercy Health - Regional Medical Center, LLC, Robert Moderwell, Phil R. Stammitti. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12563626. Filed by Darian Ayala Velazquez. (Tor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Defendant Phil R. Stammitti, Lorain County Sheriff,
Att: 3 Summons to Defendant Deputy Robert Moderwell,
Att: 4 Summons to Defendant Corrections Officer Yvette Beckwith,
Att: 5 Summons to Defendant Corrections Nurse John Allen,
Att: 6 Summons to Defendant Corrections Officer Eric Hollis,
Att: 7 Summons to Defendant Corrections Officer Jason Jancsura,
Att: 8 Summons to Defendant Corrections Officer Ryan Frizell,
Att: 9 Summons to Defendant Corrections Sergeant Cenu Glover,
Att: 10 Summons to Defendant Corrections Nurse Brooks, First Name Unknown,
Att: 11 Summons to Defendant Bon Secours Mercy Health, Inc.,
Att: 12 Summons to Defendant Bon Secours Mercy Health Medical Group LLC,
Att: 13 Summons to Defendant Bon Secours Mercy Health Foundation,
Att: 14 Summons to Defendant Mercy Health - Regional Medical Center, LLC,
Att: 15 Summons to Defendant John M. Doan, D.O.
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 05/17 1:24 PM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 05/17 1:25 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]