Massachusetts District Court
Judge:M Page Kelley
Case #: 1:24-cv-11316
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2024 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
Juliette Miller
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP Ten Post Office Square, Suite 1330
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Douglas I. Louison
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Claire Chang
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff
contact info
Defendant
Town of Stoughton
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP Ten Post Office Square, Suite 1330
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Douglas I. Louison
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP
contact info
Claire Chang
Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Alckman DiTusa, LLC 1550 Main Street, Suite 401
Springfield, MA 01103
Represented By
Robert A. DiTusa
Alekman Ditusa, LLC
contact info
Laura D. Mangini
Alekman Ditusa, LLC
contact info

GPO Feb 21 2025
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated, plaintiff's motion to compel further discovery from the Town is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Regarding discovery of students' records, in light of FERPA's requirement that the parents be notified and given time to object, the court allows defendants fourteen days from the date of this Order to provide notice to the parents and allows ten days after that for the parents to object. If no objections are made, the defendants must produce all documents within the following three weeks. (LTV)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Saturday, May 03, 2025
49 49 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Sat 05/03 10:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re35 MOTION for Discovery to Permit Disclosure of Juvenile Records filed by Norfolk District Attorney's Office. (Johnston, Tara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
48 48 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/16 10:56 AM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting47 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery to be completed by 8/8/2025 (LTV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
47 47 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/15 4:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 8, 2025 to Complete Discovery by Jane Doe.(Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
46 46 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/03 5:32 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline to respond to35 Motion for Discovery to Permit Disclosure of Juvenile Records is 5/4/2025. (Ghirardini, Carlisle)
Related: [-]
45 45 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/03 4:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to May 4, 2025 to File Response/Reply by Norfolk District Attorney's Office.(Johnston, Tara)
Related: [-]
44 44 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lyn Johnston on behalf of Norfolk District Attorney's Office (Johnston, Tara)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 03/31 12:25 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact the session [LINK:here] . Status Conference set for 5/13/2025 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (LTV)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
36 36 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 03/21 1:46 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re35 MOTION for Discovery to Permit Disclosure of Juvenile Records filed by Jane Doe.(Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Permit Disclosure of Juvenile Records
35 35 motion Discovery Fri 03/21 1:44 PM
MOTION for Discovery to Permit Disclosure of Juvenile Records by Jane Doe.(Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/07 5:24 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting33 Motion for Extension of Time. (Ferguson, Kerry)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/07 10:42 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Order Deadlines (Unopposed) by Town of Stoughton.(Chang, Claire)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 11 pgs order Memorandum & Order Fri 02/21 6:06 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated, plaintiff's motion to compel further discovery from the Town is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Regarding discovery of students' records, in light of FERPA's requirement that the parents be notified and given time to object, the court allows defendants fourteen days from the date of this Order to provide notice to the parents and allows ten days after that for the parents to object. If no objections are made, the defendants must produce all documents within the following three weeks. (LTV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
31 31 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 02/11 2:37 PM
Opposition re29 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production of Documents filed by Town of Stoughton, Juliette Miller. (Louison, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
30 30 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 01/28 1:23 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re29 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production of Documents filed by Jane Doe.(Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Def. Response to Production of Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Request for Local Rule 7.1 Conference,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Def. Reponse to 7.1 dispute,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter of Merit
29 29 motion Compel Tue 01/28 1:21 PM
MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production of Documents by Jane Doe.(Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
28 28 notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Fri 01/24 10:31 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Status conference set for 3/4/2025 is cancelled. New date to issue at a later date. (LTV)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 01/24 9:47 AM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting26 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Fact depositions to be completed by 4/25/25; fact discovery deadline 5/9/25; plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 5/30/25; defendants' expert disclosures due by 7/7/25; expert depositions completed by 8/29/25; dispositive motions due by 9/30/25. The court will set a status conference after the close of fact discovery at a later date. (Ferguson, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 01/23 9:55 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 9, 2025 to Complete Discovery by Jane Doe.(Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/25 2:39 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Status Conference set for 3/4/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 Related [+] before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-] mote only
Thursday, September 05, 2024
24 24 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/05 11:52 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jane Doe. Town of Stoughton served on 9/5/2024, answer due 9/26/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Jane Doe. (Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/21 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Chang on behalf of Juliette Miller, Town of Stoughton (Chang, Claire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
22 22 order Order Wed 08/14 2:22 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The court has reviewed13 the parties' joint submission and is inclined to adopt the proposed deadlines without holding a scheduling conference, if the parties agree that the court can adopt the proposed deadlines based on the joint submission. To request a scheduling conference, counsel should email Deputy Clerk Vieira (leonardo_vieira@mad.uscourts.gov), copying opposing counsel, by close of business on August 16, 2024, with proposed dates for the scheduling conference. If the parties agree that the court can adopt the proposed deadlines based on the joint submission, they do not need to take further action. The court will assume that the parties agree if neither party timely requests a scheduling conference. Barring a request for a scheduling conference, initial disclosures are to be completed by 8/15/24; except for good cause shown, no motions seeking leave to add new parties, or to amend the pleadings to assert new claims or defenses, may be filed after 2/15/25; requests for production of documents and interrogatories must be served by 2/15/25; requests for admission must be served by 1/30/25; fact depositions must be completed by 2/15/25; fact discovery closes 3/3/25; plaintiff's trial expert designations and disclosures must be made by 3/30/35; defendant's trial expert designations and disclosures must be made by 5/1/25; trial expert depositions must be completed by 6/30/25; expert discovery closes 6/30/25. The court will set a status conference after the close of fact discovery. Dispositive motions due 7/30/25, with oppositions due 21 days after service of the motion(s) and reply(ies) due 14 days after service of the opposition(s). Regarding discovery disputes, if the parties agree, counsel may forego formal motion practice and email Deputy Clerk Vieira to request a hearing on the discovery dispute, copying opposing counsel unless the matter is ex parte. If either party wishes to engage in formal motion practice, however, the parties must do so. (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Protective Order Wed 08/14 2:20 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 08/14 2:18 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting15 Motion for Protective Order (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 08/13 7:36 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Tue 08/13 6:59 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the filing of the Consent of all parties to jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge16 , the Clerk shall reassign this case to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Tue 08/13 6:55 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing - In light of the filing of the Consent of all parties to jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge16 , the scheduling conference set for 8/13/2024 is canceled. (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
16 16 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 08/12 11:32 AM
CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jane Doe.. (Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Protective Order Mon 08/12 11:16 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Jane Doe.(Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order
Monday, August 05, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Rescheduling Mon 08/05 1:13 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2024 RESET for 8/13/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 Related [+] before Judge Indira Talwani. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (MacDonald, Gail)
Related: [-] mote only
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
13 13 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Tue 07/16 3:56 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference .(Louison, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order
12 12 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Tue 07/16 3:28 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Tue 07/16 10:51 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) Juliette Miller . (Louison, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Wed 07/10 5:24 PM
SEE attached NOTICE of Scheduling Conference, with attached PROPOSED ORDER TEMPLATE. When filing the Joint Statement, counsel must attach a separate, proposed scheduling order using the template attached to this Notice. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2024 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 Related [+] before Judge Indira Talwani. This proceeding will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov .(MacDonald, Gail)
Related: [-] mote only
Att: 1 Proposed Order Template
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 06/25 9:34 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Impound Affidavit of Plaintiff and Motion for Leave to Proceed Using a Pseudonym7 . Plaintiff shall identify herself to Defendants, and all parties shall proceed in this matter with all documents filed on the public docket identifying Plaintiff only as Jane Doe and without including her address. Plaintiff shall promptly file her Affidavit of True Name under seal. Counsel will receive an email within twenty-four (24) hours of this order with instructions for submitting sealed documents for which leave has been granted in accordance with the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court of Massachusetts. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/24 10:23 AM
MOTION Impound Affidavit of Plaintiff and Leave to Proceed Using a Pseudonym (Unopposed) by Jane Doe.(Mangini, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Tue 06/11 10:20 AM
STATE COURT Record. (Louison, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/29 4:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Juliette Miller, Town of Stoughton.(Louison, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
4 4 notice Notice - Other Wed 05/22 12:51 PM
NOTICE by Juliette Miller, Town of Stoughton re1 Notice of Removal, of Correction of Notice of Removal(Louison, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
3 3 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Tue 05/21 4:13 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Barbosa, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 05/21 3:28 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Phillips, Sophie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/21 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Juliette Miller, Town of Stoughton Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10422726-(Louison, Douglas) Modified on 5/21/2024 (Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint