Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Michael P Mills
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 1:24-cv-00092
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 17, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2024 3:01 AM CST
Defendant
City of Booneville, Mississippi
Represented By
Howard David Clark, III
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Gregory Todd Butler
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Austin Kidd
Represented By
Shea Stewart Scott
Daniel, Coker, Horton & Bell
contact info
Wilton V. Byars, III
Daniel, Coker, Horton & Bell
contact info
Defendant
Briley Strickland
Represented By
Shea Stewart Scott
Daniel, Coker, Horton & Bell
contact info
Wilton V. Byars, III
Daniel, Coker, Horton & Bell
contact info
Defendant
D. J. Wilkerson
Represented By
Shea Stewart Scott
Daniel, Coker, Horton & Bell
contact info
Wilton V. Byars, III
Daniel, Coker, Horton & Bell
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnie Lee Lambert
Represented By
Richard Shane McLaughlin
Mclaughlin Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, December 13, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/13 11:46 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/13/2024. (spw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Service Tue 09/10 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of City of Booneville, Mississippi to Plaintiff and Co-Defendants. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Service Fri 09/06 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of City of Booneville, Mississippi to Plaintiff. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Service Thu 08/29 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Johnie Lee Lambert to Defendants. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 08/20 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wilton V. Byars, III on behalf of Briley Strickland, D. J. Wilkerson (Byars, Wilton)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Service Tue 08/20 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Shea Stewart Scott on behalf of Briley Strickland, D. J. Wilkerson. (Scott, Shea)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/20 11:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Briley Strickland. (Scott, Shea)
Related: [-]
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/20 11:54 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by D. J. Wilkerson. (Scott, Shea)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Service Fri 08/16 1:49 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Shea Stewart Scott on behalf of Austin Kidd. (Scott, Shea)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/16 8:35 AM
ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/16/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Conference Fri 08/16 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2025 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Trial Thu 08/15 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 9/15/2025 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before Senior Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)
Related: [-]
21 21 4 pgs order Order Thu 08/15 10:52 AM
ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/15/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Case Management Order Thu 08/15 10:50 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2025 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 2/14/2025. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 9/16/2024. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 11/14/2024. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 12/16/2024. Motions due by 3/7/2025. Settlement Conference set for 1/8/2025 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/15/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Case Management Conference Thu 08/15 10:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 8/15/2024. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Service Wed 08/14 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of City of Booneville, Mississippi to Plaintiff, Johnie Lee Lambert. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/05 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Johnie Lee Lambert Briley Strickland served on 8/5/2024. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/05 2:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Johnie Lee Lambert D. J. Wilkerson served on 8/2/2024. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/29 7:53 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by City of Booneville, Mississippi. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/26 5:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Austin Kidd. (Scott, Shea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Thu 07/25 9:40 AM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to D.J. Wilkerson and Briley Strickland (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Tue 06/25 10:28 AM
DISREGARD ENTRY - ENTERED IN ERROR CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer Re: Austin Kidd. (lgm) Modified on 6/25/2024 (lgm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Tue 06/18 4:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to D.J. Wilkerson and Briley Stickland (jla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 06/13 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wilton V. Byars, III on behalf of Austin Kidd (Byars, Wilton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/11 3:56 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Austin Kidd's Answer due 7/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/11/24. (rrh)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/11 3:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Austin Kidd. (Scott, Shea)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/10 9:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Johnie Lee Lambert City of Booneville, Mississippi served on 5/29/2024. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/04 11:21 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Booneville, Mississippi's Answer due 7/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/4/24. (rrh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Mon 06/03 3:23 PM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2024 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/3/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/03 9:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Johnie Lee Lambert Austin Kidd served on 5/31/2024. (McLaughlin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/31 4:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of Booneville, Mississippi. (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 05/31 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard David Clark, III on behalf of City of Booneville, Mississippi (Clark, Howard)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 05/31 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of City of Booneville, Mississippi (Butler, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 05/17 11:01 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/17/2024. (jla)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/17 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Booneville, Mississippi, Austin Kidd, Briley Strickland, D. J. Wilkerson. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/17 10:36 AM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2389367, filed by Johnie Lee Lambert. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Fri 05/17 10:38 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
Related: [-]