Connecticut District Court
Judge:Omar A Williams
Referred: Thomas O Farrish
Case #: 3:24-cv-00897
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2024 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Continental Casualty Company
Represented By
Kevin Buckley
Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass LLP
contact info
Tania Ann Gondiosa
Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass
contact info
Daniel O'Connell
Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Decio Nascimento
Represented By
Joshua Allen Zelen
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Daniel F McGuire
Anderson Kill, P.C.
contact info
Carrie Maylor DiCanio
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Jussen
Represented By
Joshua Allen Zelen
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Daniel F McGuire
Anderson Kill, P.C.
contact info
Carrie Maylor DiCanio
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC
Represented By
Joshua Allen Zelen
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Daniel F McGuire
Anderson Kill, P.C.
contact info
Carrie Maylor DiCanio
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Norbury Partners LP
Represented By
Joshua Allen Zelen
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Daniel F McGuire
Anderson Kill, P.C.
contact info
Carrie Maylor DiCanio
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank Jones, II
Represented By
Joshua Allen Zelen
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info
Daniel F McGuire
Anderson Kill, P.C.
contact info
Carrie Maylor DiCanio
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/30 4:46 PM
REPLY to Response to37 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion filed by Continental Casualty Company. (Buckley, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
39 39 motion File Excess Pages Wed 01/22 12:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Continental Casualty Company. (O'Connell, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/15 9:14 PM
REPLY to Response to37 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion ,34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Continental Casualty Company's Duty to Defend filed by Norbury Partners LP, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Decio Nascimento, Frank Jones, II, Sean Jussen.(DiCanio, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeremy E. Deutsch,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
37 37 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 12/10 3:35 PM
Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion by Continental Casualty Company.Responses due by 1/2/2025(O'Connell, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Kevin F Buckley,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 July 2020 Firm Brochure,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 December 2020 Firm Brochure,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 March 2021 Firm Brochure,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support
Friday, November 22, 2024
36 36 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Fri 11/22 2:46 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.35 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's cross-motion for judgment on the pleadings, which also shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion, shall be filed on or before December 9, 2024. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated response to Defendant's motion and reply in support of their own on or before January 15, 2025. Defendants may file a reply in support of its own motion on or before January 30, 2025. It is so ordered. The court wishes defense counsel a quick and complete recovery. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/22/24. (Wagner, R)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/25 10:07 AM
Reset Deadlines as to34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings: Response due by 12/9/2024. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/25 11:39 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR - WRONG CASE: Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/5/2025. (Velez, F) Modified on 11/25/2024 (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 11/25 11:42 AM
Docket Entry Correction re Set Deadlines/Hearings: Entered in error. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Tue 11/19 7:43 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply /Cross-Motion as to34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Continental Casualty Company's Duty to Defend by Continental Casualty Company. (O'Connell, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
34 34 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 10/10 10:24 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Continental Casualty Company's Duty to Defend by Frank Jones, II, Sean Jussen, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Norbury Partners LP.Responses due by 10/31/2024(DiCanio, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Carrie Maylor DiCanio, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20
Monday, September 09, 2024
33 33 order Order Mon 09/09 5:16 PM
ORDER. The court thanks the parties for their Local Rule 26(f) Report. See ECF No.32 . Though the parties do not ask to be excused from holding a conference with the court prior to a scheduling order entering, the court finds that the report alone is sufficient to set the litigation schedule. The court hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein. All deadlines save those state herein are stayed pending disposition of any motions for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c). Plaintiffs' Rule 12(c) motion shall be filed on or before October 10, 2024. Defendant's cross-motion, which also shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion, shall be filed on or before November 25, 2024. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated response to Defendants motion and reply in support of their own on or before December 19, 2024. Defendant may file a reply in support of its own motion on or before December 30, 2024. Should disposition of those cross-motions not dispose of the case entirely, the court will set any additional necessary deadlines in its ruling on the cross-motions. The parties may separately request an audience with the court as appropriate or necessary. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/9/24. (Wagner, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
32 32 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 09/06 3:48 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DiCanio, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel O'Connell on behalf of Continental Casualty Company (O'Connell, Daniel)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Allen Zelen on behalf of Frank Jones, II, Sean Jussen, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Norbury Partners LP (Zelen, Joshua)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Maylor DiCanio on behalf of Frank Jones, II, Sean Jussen, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Norbury Partners LP (DiCanio, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/01 12:01 PM
ORDER granting25 MOTION for Attorney Daniel M O'Connell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/01 11:06 AM
ORDER granting24 MOTION for Attorney Joshua A. Zelen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/01 11:03 AM
ORDER granting23 MOTION for Attorney Carrie Maylor DiCanio to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
25 25 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/31 12:56 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel M O'Connell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Continental Casualty Company.(Buckley, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Daniel M O'Connell,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
24 24 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/31 12:55 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua A. Zelen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Frank Jones, II, Sean Jussen, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Norbury Partners LP.(McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joshua A. Zelen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing
23 23 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/31 12:54 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Carrie Maylor DiCanio to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Frank Jones, II, Sean Jussen, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Norbury Partners LP.(McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Carrie Maylor DiCanio, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing
22 22 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/31 9:14 AM
ORDER. The motions (ECF Nos.19 ,20 and21 ) are DENIED for failure to conform to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) (The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating.). The motions can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 7/31/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
21 21 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/30 2:59 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel M O'Connell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7852145) by Continental Casualty Company.(Buckley, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Daniel M O'Connell,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing
20 20 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/30 12:42 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Carrie Maylor DiCanio to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7851816) by Frank Jones, II, Sean Jussen, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Norbury Partners LP.(McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Carrie Maylor DiCanio, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing
19 19 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/30 12:40 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua A. Zelen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7851813) by Frank Jones, II, Sean Jussen, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Norbury Partners LP.(McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joshua A. Zelen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, July 29, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/29 10:07 AM
Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/6/2024. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tania Ann Gondiosa on behalf of Continental Casualty Company (Gondiosa, Tania)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/25 9:02 AM
ORDER granting16 MOTION for Attorney Tania Ann Gondiosa to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 7/25/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
16 16 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/24 4:49 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Tania Ann Gondiosa to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7846099) by Continental Casualty Company.(Buckley, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Tania A. Gondiosa,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 07/24 3:19 PM
Disclosure Statement by Continental Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. (Buckley, Kevin)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/24 3:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Continental Casualty Company.(Buckley, Kevin)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/24 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Buckley on behalf of Continental Casualty Company (Buckley, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/08 2:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norbury Partners LP, Frank Jones, II, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Sean Jussen. Continental Casualty Company served on 7/3/2024, answer due 7/24/2024. (McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 06/05 3:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Continental Casualty Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel F McGuire* *Anderson Kill, P.C.* *1055 Washington Blvd., Suite 530* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 06/04 3:48 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Continental Casualty Company. (McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 2:49 PM
Disclosure Statement by Norbury Partners LP. (McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 2:47 PM
Disclosure Statement by Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC. (McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Mon 05/20 3:22 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Electronic Filing Order,7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,6 Standing Order re: Letters,5 Standing Protective Order,1 Complaint, filed by Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Sean Jussen, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Partners LP, Frank Jones, II,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement Signed by Clerk on 05/20/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
7 7 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Mon 05/20 3:19 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
6 6 intord Standing Order re: Letters Mon 05/20 3:19 PM
Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/17/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Mon 05/20 3:18 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/17/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 05/20 3:16 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/17/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 05/20 3:14 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/16/2024. Discovery due by 11/16/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2024. Signed by Clerk on 05/17/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Mon 05/20 9:22 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2024.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/17 4:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Continental Casualty Company ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7768295.), filed by Norbury Partners LP, Frank Jones II, Decio Nascimento, Norbury Capital Advisors GP LLC, Sean Jussen.(McGuire, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 05/20 1:20 PM
Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]