Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-21217

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Carlota M Bohm
Case #: 2:24-bk-21226
Case Filed:May 17, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC
3876 Saxonburg Blvd
Cheswick, PA 15024-2228
Represented By
Daniel R. Schimizzi
Whiteford Taylor & Preston LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
16 16 order Amended Schedule - Judge Bohm Thu 08/15 1:59 PM
It is hereby ordered that, whereas the Debtor(s) filed amended schedule(s) at Doc. No.15 , any objections to the amendment(s) must be filed in accordance with W.PA.LBR. 1009-1. Together with service of notice of the amendment(s), the Debtor(s) shall provide notice to all affected parties, the Trustee (if one is appointed), and the United States Trustee that, to the extent applicable based upon the amendment(s) made, any objection to discharge, request for a 341 meeting, and/or objections to exemptions shall be filed on or before thirty days from the date of this Order or the date set forth in the Section 341 Meeting Notice, whichever is later. If the Debtor(s) fail to file a certificate of service showing that proper notice of the amendment(s) has been given in accordance with the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Local Rules, including W.PA.LBR. 1009-1, and this Order, then the amendment(s) are null and void. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order and notice on this matter pursuant to W.PA.LBR 5005-11(c). Judge Carlota Bohm. Signed on 8/15/2024. Related [+]. (dric)
Related: [-] :15 Amended Schedules A B C G H I J
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
15 15 misc Amended Schedules A B C G H I J Wed 08/14 4:29 PM
The following schedule(s) have been amended: Schedule G Schedule H. Filed by Debtor 3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC (Schimizzi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
14 14 order Amended Schedule - Judge Bohm Mon 08/12 2:06 PM
It is hereby ordered that, whereas the Debtor(s) filed amended schedule(s) at Doc. No.13 , any objections to the amendment(s) must be filed in accordance with W.PA.LBR. 1009-1. Together with service of notice of the amendment(s), the Debtor(s) shall provide notice to all affected parties, the Trustee (if one is appointed), and the United States Trustee that, to the extent applicable based upon the amendment(s) made, any objection to discharge, request for a 341 meeting, and/or objections to exemptions shall be filed on or before thirty days from the date of this Order or the date set forth in the Section 341 Meeting Notice, whichever is later. If the Debtor(s) fail to file a certificate of service showing that proper notice of the amendment(s) has been given in accordance with the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Local Rules, including W.PA.LBR. 1009-1, and this Order, then the amendment(s) are null and void. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's Order and notice on this matter pursuant to W.PA.LBR 5005-11(c). Judge Carlota Bohm. Signed on 8/12/2024. Related [+]. (dric)
Related: [-] :13 Amended Schedules A B C G H I J
Friday, August 09, 2024
13 13 misc Amended Schedules A B C G H I J Fri 08/09 6:09 PM
The following schedule(s) have been amended: Schedule G Schedule H. Filed by Debtor 3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC (Schimizzi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
12 12 trustee 341 by Telephone Thu 06/27 2:53 PM
The upcoming 341(a) meeting is scheduled to be held by phone. Call 1-877-612-9054 and use access code 4831906 to join the meeting. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. (Bradley, Kate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
11 11 utility Update Meeting of Creditors Wed 06/26 11:41 AM
Update Meeting of Creditors, Deadlines Updated 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/24/2024 at 01:00 PM via Ch 11 341 telephonic hearing. Last day to oppose dischargeability due by 9/23/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 10/22/2024. (mgut)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
10 10 misc Petition Completed Mon 06/17 11:17 PM
Petition Completed Filed by Debtor 3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC (Schimizzi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 court Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Thu 05/23 2:04 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Related [+]. (obro)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor 3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
8 8 misc Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29 Wed 05/22 5:37 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor 3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC (Lindsay, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Mailing Matrix
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
7 7 9 pgs order Order -multi- Tue 05/21 3:45 PM
Order - An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and rule 1002-6 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania directing joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of the following entities: South Hills Operations, LLC; Monroeville Operations, LLC; Mt. Lebanon Operations, LLC; Murrysville Operations, LLC; Cheswick Rehabilitation and Wellness Center, LLC; 3876Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC; North Strabane Rehabilitation and Wellness Center, LLC; 100 Tandem Village Road Propco, LLC; Maybrook-C Briarcliff Opco, LLC; Maybrook-C Briarcliff Propco, LLC; Maybrook-C Evergreen Opco, LLC; Maybrook-C Evergreen Propco, LLC; Maybrook-C Kade Opco, LLC; Maybrook-C Kade Propco, LLC; Maybrook-C Latrobe Opco, LLC; Maybrook-C Latrobe Propco, LLC; Maybrook-C Overlook Opco, LLC; Maybrook-C Overlook Propco, LLC; Maybrook-C Silver Oaks Opco, LLC; Maybrook-C Silver Oaks Propco, LLC; Maybrook-C Whitecliff Opco, LLC; Maybrook-C Whitecliff Propco, LLC. The docket in the chapter 11 case of South Hills Operations, LLC, Case No. 24-21217 CMB, should be consulted for all matters affecting the Chapter 11 Cases of any foregoing entities. (obro)
Related: [-]
6 6 crditcrd none Tue 05/21 8:36 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-21226 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16744163, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/20 10:58 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by William M. Buchanan Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Buchanan, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/20 10:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kate Bradley Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Bradley, Kate)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 18, 2024
3 3 utility Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines Sat 05/18 9:28 PM
Deadlines Updated, Deadlines Updated Related [+]. Atty Disclosure Statement due 5/31/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 5/31/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/31/2024. Mailing Matrix due 5/31/2024. PLEASE NOTE: FINAL DUE DATES FOR ALL DOCUMENTS ARE PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FILED AT DOC. NO. 6 ON LEAD CASE 24-21217 IN ADDITION, THE FOLLOWING DEADLINES WERE TERMINATED AS UNNECESSARY: FORM B119 AND SCHEDULED C. (mgut)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor 3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC, 2 Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies
2 2 court Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies Sat 05/18 9:26 PM
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies. Assigned Judge: BOHM.. Pursuant to Local Rule 1017-2, the United States Trustee is deemed to have filed a Motion To Dismiss this case, and that Motion will be deemed GRANTED, if any deadline set forth in the first docket entry or any of the following deadlines is not met. Incomplete Filings: DECLARATION OF SCHEDULES, ATTORNEY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS, AND MAILING MATRIX Related [+]. (mgut)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor 3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC
Friday, May 17, 2024
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Fri 05/17 2:58 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by 3876 Saxonburg Boulevard Propco, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 11/13/2024. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 05/31/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/16/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 09/16/2024. Notice to Debtor by Non-Attorney Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Form B119 due by 05/31/2024. Schedule A/B due 05/31/2024. Schedule C due 05/31/2024. Schedule D due 05/31/2024. Schedule E/F due 05/31/2024. Schedule G due 05/31/2024. Schedule H due 05/31/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/31/2024. Summary of schedules due 05/31/2024. Informational Notice Required by 342b due by 05/31/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 05/31/2024.. (Schimizzi, Daniel)
Related: [-]