California Central District Court
Judge:Consuelo B Marshall
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-04153
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2024 12:38 AM PST
Counter Claimant
KB Exchange Properties, LLC
Represented By
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Jessica Megan Leano
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
KB Property Advisors, Inc.
Represented By
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Jessica Megan Leano
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
KB Property Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Jessica Megan Leano
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Kingsbarn Real Estate Capital, LLC
Represented By
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Jessica Megan Leano
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Kingsbarn Realty Capital, LLC
Represented By
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Jessica Megan Leano
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
KB Home
Represented By
Ronald A. Valenzuela
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Lee B. Bennin
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Eric D. Sidler
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Sheldon H Klein
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Defendant
KB Exchange Properties, LLC
Represented By
Elliot J Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
KB Property Advisors, Inc.
Represented By
Elliot J Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
KB Property Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Elliot J Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kingsbarn Real Estate Capital, LLC
Represented By
Elliot J Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kingsbarn Realty Capital, LLC
Represented By
Elliot J Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Brett L Foster
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Mark A. Miller
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Tamara L Kapaloski
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Elliot J. Hales
Dorsey And Whitney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KB Home
Represented By
Ronald A. Valenzuela
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Lee B. Bennin
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Eric D. Sidler
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info
Sheldon H Klein
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
68 68 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 04/29 4:05 PM
DECLARATION of Eric D. Sidler in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint 66 filed by Plaintiff KB Home.(Sidler, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redline Comparison of Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Email re KB v Kingsbarn - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Email re Defendants' Discovery Responses,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Defendants' Amended Rsps to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Email re Kingsbarn's Second Amended Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Kingsbarn Company Brochure 2024
67 67 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/29 3:57 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint 66 filed by Plaintiff KB Home. (Sidler, Eric)
Related: [-]
66 66 motion Leave Tue 04/29 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff KB Home. Motion set for hearing on 5/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Sidler, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order