New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Case #: 2:24-cv-06215
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 3:36 AM EST
Appellant
ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS
Represented By
JOSEPH K. JONES
Jones, Wolf & Kapasi, LLC
contact info
Appellee
WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB
Represented By
JASON BRETT SCHWARTZ
Friedman Vartolo, LLP
contact info
In Re
ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS
Notice Only
bknwk

GPO Jan 29 2025
OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/29/2025. (lag, )

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 01/30 10:43 AM
ORDER affirming Bankruptcy Court's 5/7/2024 Order. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/29/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
17 17 7 pgs order Opinion Thu 01/30 10:36 AM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/29/2025. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Mon 01/27 5:05 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS.(JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Thursday, December 12, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Thu 12/12 5:40 PM
Letter from Jason Schwartz, Attorney for Appellee re 12 Text Order,,,. (SCHWARTZ, JASON)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 08, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Sun 12/08 7:21 PM
STATUS REPORT was filed by ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS, ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Thu 12/05 10:05 AM
Letter from Joseph K. Jones, Esq. re 12 Text Order,,,. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Text Order Thu 12/05 9:40 AM
TEXT ORDER re10 Letter: This Court is in receipt of Appellant's letter (D.E.10 ), in which Appellant states that a sheriff's sale of the real property at issue was scheduled for November 1, 2024 and that, " [i]f this Court were to decide this appeal after November 1, 2024, even if it granted appellant's request and reversed the decision from the Bankruptcy Court, it may be too late, as the Kostopoulos home would have already been sold at the Sheriff's Sale." By December 10, 2024, Appellant shall file a letter detailing whether the sheriff's sale occurred and, if so, showing cause for why the instant appeal should not be dismissed as moot. Appellee may file a letter response explaining their position no later than December 12, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/5/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Mon 11/18 2:23 PM
Letter from Joseph K. Jones, Esq.. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Tue 10/22 3:21 PM
Letter from Joseph K. Jones, Esq. re8 Letter. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Mon 10/14 3:46 PM
Letter from Joseph K. Jones, Esq. re7 Appellant's Reply Brief. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Tue 09/24 10:28 AM
Letter from Joseph K. Jones, Esq. re1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 25, 2024
7 7 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Sun 08/25 4:48 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS. (JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
6 6 appeal Appellees Brief Tue 08/13 4:09 PM
Appellee's BRIEF by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. Appellant Reply Brief due by 8/27/2024.(SCHWARTZ, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Pgs. 001-131,
Att: 2 Appendix Pgs. 132-254
Sunday, July 14, 2024
5 5 appeal Appellants Brief Sun 07/14 7:41 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS, ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS.(JONES, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Friday, June 28, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 06/28 2:06 PM
Bankruptcy appeal set for 10/7/2024 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
3 3 appeal Designation of Record on Appeal (Bankruptcy) Fri 06/28 1:57 PM
COUNTER DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Appellee WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB re2 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as 'Courtesy Copies' and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically; the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant's brief; the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee's brief. Appellant Brief due by 7/15/2024.(dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal
Friday, May 31, 2024
4 4 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 06/28 3:01 PM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Appellant ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS re2 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court's records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Susan D. Wigenton, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as 'Courtesy Copies' and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically; the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant's brief; the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee's brief.(dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Issues,
Att: 2 Exhibits in Support of Designation,
Att: 3 Transmittal
Friday, May 17, 2024
2 2 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 05/21 10:35 AM
Notice of AMENDED APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 22-18145 filed by ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS.(jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Fri 05/17 11:27 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 22-18145 filed by ATHENA KOSTOPOULOS. (mj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter,
Att: 2 Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service