Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02556
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 17, 2024
Terminated:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2024 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
Trihex Athletic Apparel, LLC
Represented By
Lyndsay M. Flagg
Benesch Friedlander Coplan And Aronoff LLP
contact info
Richard E. Hepp
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ian Hurt
Represented By
Michael Fradin
Fradin Law Office
contact info
James L. Simon
Simon Law Co.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/10 8:44 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to14 Notice of Dismissal. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/09 2:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Ian Hurt. (Fradin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
13 13 order Order Mon 11/18 9:26 AM
NOTATION ORDER - The Court understands the parties have reached a settlement. The parties are ORDERED to file a status report updating the Court on their progress on or before 12/16/2024, unless a stipulated dismissal has been filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/18/24. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 11/15 7:50 PM
STATUS REPORT / Joint Status Report by Defendant Trihex Athletic Apparel, LLC. (Hepp, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 11/12 1:02 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER: The parties have failed to file their joint Rule 26(f) Report as set forth in the Notice of Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Doc.5 ). Consequently, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED and the parties are ORDERED to file their Rule 26(f) Report by 11/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/12/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 10/08 9:08 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting9 Second Joint Motion for Continuance. Pretrial Conference reset for 11/14/2024 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/8/24. (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
9 9 motion Continue Mon 10/07 8:52 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Plaintiff Ian Hurt. (Fradin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 09/03 8:59 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting7 Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference reset for 10/10/2024 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/3/24. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
7 7 motion Continue Fri 08/30 4:51 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Plaintiff Ian Hurt. (Fradin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/26 2:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Trihex Athletic Apparel, LLC. (Hepp, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 08/07 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2024 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 7:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Hepp for Defendant Trihex Athletic Apparel, LLC (Hepp, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 20, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 07/20 10:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Trihex Athletic Apparel, LLC. Trihex Athletic Apparel, LLC served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Fradin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 05/20 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Trihex Athletic Apparel, LLC. (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/17 11:19 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Trihex Athletic Apparel, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9979541), filed by Ian Hurt. (Fradin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Hurt Consent Form,
Att: 2 Summons Form,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet